EP2673027 - REMOVAL OF CANNULA PART FROM BASE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unomedical A/S Birkero̸d Kongevej 2 3460 Birkero̸d / DK | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GYRN, Steffen Ydunsvej 14 DK-4100 Ringsted / DK | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 12703300.9 | 07.02.2012 | WO2012EP52037 | Priority number, date | US201161441038P | 09.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161441038 P | EP20110154049 | 10.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11154049 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012107440 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673027 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/172, A61M5/142 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNG EINES KANÜLENTEILS VON EINEM BASISTEIL | [2013/51] | English: | REMOVAL OF CANNULA PART FROM BASE PART | [2013/51] | French: | RETRAIT D'UNE PARTIE DE CANULE À PARTIR D'UNE PARTIE DE BASE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 19.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5968011 (LARSEN BJORN GULLAK [DK], et al) [X] 11,13 * column 4, line 55 - line 63; figures 5-7,18 *[Y] 12; | [XYI]US2008119707 (STAFFORD GARY ASHLEY [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9-11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028]; figure - * [Y] 2,3,8 [I] 4,6; | [Y]US2009118592 (KLITGAARD PETER CHRISTIAN [DK]) [Y] 2,3,8,12 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0126]; figure - * | by applicant | US2004162521 | US2008004515 | US2008199707 |