EP2675945 - NANOWIRE PREPARATION METHODS, COMPOSITIONS, AND ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMSDEN, Willaim, D. C/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 02 /
OLLMANN, Richard, R. C/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 03 /
LYNCH, Doreen, C. C/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12703916.2 | 12.01.2012 | WO2012US21028 | Priority number, date | US201213347986 | 11.01.2012 Original published format: US201213347986 | US201161442874P | 15.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161442874 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012112239 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675945 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/60, B22F9/24, C30B7/14 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,US);
C30B7/14 (KR);
C30B29/60 (KR);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/0547 (KR,EP,US);
B22F2998/00, B22F3/003 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | NANODRAHTHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ARTIKEL | [2013/52] | English: | NANOWIRE PREPARATION METHODS, COMPOSITIONS, AND ARTICLES | [2013/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE NANOFIL, COMPOSITIONS ET ARTICLES | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 02.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAY]JP2009155674 (UNIV OSAKA) [XD] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * [A] 1-4,6,8[Y] 5,7,9; | [XDAY]US2010242679 (YU YI-HSIUAN [TW], et al) [XD] 10 * paragraph [0010] * * tables 1-3 * [A] 1-4,6-8 [Y] 5,9; | [XY] - BOLEININGER J ET AL, "Microfluidic continuous flow synthesis of rod-shaped gold and silver nanocrystals", PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY CHEMICAL PHYSICS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 8, no. 33, doi:10.1039/B604666E, ISSN 1463-9076, (20060907), pages 3824 - 3827, (20060626), XP002535011 [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * figure 2 * * page 3826 * [Y] 5,7,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B604666E | [XY] - SUHANYA DURAISWAMY ET AL, "Droplet-Based Microfluidic Synthesis of Anisotropic Metal Nanocrystals", SMALL, (20091218), vol. 5, no. 24, doi:10.1002/smll.200901453, ISSN 1613-6810, pages 2828 - 2834, XP055026129 [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * figure 2 * * Experimental Section; paragraph [0005] * [Y] 5,7,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200901453 | by applicant | US2008210052 | JP2009155674 | US2010148132 | US2010242679 | JP2010255037 | CN101934377 | US2011048170 | CN102029400 | - Y. XIA ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2009), vol. 48, page 60 | - Y. SUN; B. MAYERS; T. HERRICKS; Y. XIA, NANO LETTERS, (2003), vol. 3, no. 7, pages 955 - 960 | - P.-Y. SILVERT ET AL., J. MATER. CHEM., (1996), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 573 - 577 | - J. MATER. CHEM., (1997), vol. 7, pages 293 - 299 | - CHEN ET AL., NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 466 - 74 | - Y. XIA; Y. XIONG; B. LIM; S. E. SKRABALAK, ANGEW. CLZEM. INT. ED., (2009), vol. 48, page 60 | - J. JIU; K. MURAI; D. KIM; K. KIM; K. SUGANUMA, MAT. CHEM. & PHYS., (2009), vol. 114, page 333 | - Y. C. LU; K. S. CHOU, NANOTECH., (2010), vol. 21, page 215707 | - D. CHEN ET AL., J. MATER. SCI.: MATER. ELECTRON., (2011), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 6 - 13 | - L. HU ET AL., ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 2955 - 2963 | - C. CHEN ET AL., NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 17, page 3933 | - L. ZHOU ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETTERS, (2009), vol. 94, page 153102 | - Z. C. LI ET AL., MICRO & NANO LETTERS, (2011), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 90 - 93 | - B. J. WILEY ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, page 8077 |