EP2670882 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/50] | APPARATUS FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION | ||
[2015/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2015/17] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEER, Adrianus Johannes Petrus Maria TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 NL-2628 VK Delft / NL | 02 /
DE SWART, Jozef Johannes TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 NL-2628 VK Delft / NL | 03 /
WIT, Robert Coenraad TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 NL-2628 VK Delft / NL | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/20] |
Former [2013/50] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12704560.7 | 30.01.2012 | [2016/20] | WO2012NL50049 | Priority number, date | EP20110152792 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11152792 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012105831 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670882 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670882 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/458, C23C16/54, C23C16/455, F16C32/06, B65G51/03 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
C23C16/45551 (EP,US);
C23C16/458 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/44 (US);
B65G51/03 (KR);
C23C16/455 (KR);
C23C16/4582 (US);
C23C16/4583 (US);
C23C16/54 (EP,KR,US);
F16C32/06 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ATOMSCHICHTABLAGERUNG | [2015/22] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION | [2015/22] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉPÔT DE COUCHES ATOMIQUES | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/50] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ATOMSCHICHTABLAGERUNG | ||
Former [2013/50] | APPARATUS FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION | ||
Former [2013/50] | APPAREIL POUR DÉPÔT DE COUCHES ATOMIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 18.05.2016 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IS | 18.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | IE | 30.01.2017 | LU | 30.01.2017 | MT | 30.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.05.2016 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009291209 (GRANNEMAN ERNST H A [NL], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040]; figures 3-10 *; | [A]US4444531 (BAKER CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * figure 2 * | by applicant | WO2008085474 | US2009081885 |