EP2673875 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A RELUCTANCE ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESHARNAIS, Sébastien 7 résidence Le Villeparc 78310 Maurepas / FR | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/51] | 01 /
DESHARNAIS, Sébastien 3 quai Fernand Pouillon F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | Representative(s) | Rougemont, Bernard Renault s.a.s TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [2013/51] | Application number, filing date | 12706645.4 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012FR50187 | Priority number, date | FR20110051040 | 09.02.2011 Original published format: FR 1151040 | [2013/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012107665 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2673875 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/08, H02P21/00, H02P25/08 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H02P6/08 (EP);
H02P21/0003 (US);
H02P25/08 (EP,US);
H02P6/10 (US);
H02P25/0925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN RELUKTANZMASCHINE | [2013/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A RELUCTANCE ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2013/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PILOTAGE D'UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE A RELUCTANCE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 06.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1211798 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [AD] 1-18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1,4-11 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0078] *; | [A]EP1467478 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]US2006038531 (WAKABAYASHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0052]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JPS611294B | US5189357 | US6674262 |