EP2675848 - POLAR SOLUBLE OXYGEN SCAVENGING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M&G USA Corporation State Route 2 Apple Grove, WV 25502 / US | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUDSEN, Ricardo 5328 Santo Amaro Avenue Apt. 33 04702-000 Sao Paulo / BR | 02 /
MURRAY, Aaron 316 South St. Chardon, OH 44024 / US | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/52] | 01 /
KNUDSEN, Ricardo 5328 Santo Amaro Avenue Apt. 33 04702-000 Sao Paulo / BR | ||
02 /
MURRAY, Aaron 316 South St. Chardon, OH 44024 / US | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2015/04] |
Former [2013/52] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12706984.7 | 17.02.2012 | WO2012US25744 | Priority number, date | US201161444471P | 18.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161444471 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012112957 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675848 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675848 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L67/00 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C08K5/1539 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,CN,US);
B65D81/266 (US);
C08L77/02 (CN);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L2201/14 (CN);
C08L2203/10 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08K5/098, C08L51/006 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08K5/098, C08L51/04 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L51/04 (CN);
C08L67/02, C08L9/00 (CN);
C08L67/02, C08L9/06 (CN);
C08L77/02, C08L51/04 (CN);
C08L77/02, C08L9/00 (CN);
C08L77/02, C08L9/06 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN POLAREN POLYMEREN LÖSLICHE, SAUERSTOFFABSORBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/33] | English: | POLAR SOLUBLE OXYGEN SCAVENGING COMPOSITIONS | [2013/52] | French: | DES COMPOSITIONS SOLUBLES DANS DES POLYMERES POLARES QUI ATTRAPENT L'OXYGEN E | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/52] | LÖSLICHE POLARE SAUERSTOFFABSORBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2013/52] | COMPOSITIONS DÉSOXYGÉNANTES SOLUBLES POLAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 06.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | IE | 17.02.2015 | LU | 17.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | PT | 21.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | DK | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | DK | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | DK | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | NO | 21.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0722988 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9* page 11 - page 12; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP1253171 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * claims 1,3,5 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0085] , [0091] * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]EP1704917 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,11 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048]; claims 1, 4,5,8 * * paragraphs [0084] , [0086] * * paragraph [0034] * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]US2010316824 (KNUDSEN RICARDO [BR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0089] , [0093] * [Y] 1-11; | [XP]WO2011031929 (INVISTA TECH SARL [CH], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,6,11 * example 11 *; | [X] - "Evaluation of polybutadiene scavengers and nylon scavengers in the presence of sulfoisophthalic acid", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20090401), vol. 540, no. 1, ISSN 0374-4353, page 325, XP007138884 [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2002183448 |