EP2675784 - BIO-BASED LINEAR ALKYLPHENYL SULFONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Phillip, Richard 540 Compton Road Wyoming, Ohio 45231 / US | 02 /
SCHEIBEL, Jeffrey, John 6651 Miami Trails Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 03 /
COLLIAS, Dimitris, Ioannis 4683 Cedar Village Drive Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [2017/37] |
Former [2013/52] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12707196.7 | 17.02.2012 | [2017/37] | WO2012US25540 | Priority number, date | US201161443981P | 17.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443981 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012112828 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675784 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675784 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/08, C07C309/31, C07C6/04, C07C1/24, C07C11/04 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C07C303/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C07C2/64 (EP,US);
C07C6/04 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/64, C07C15/107 (US,EP);
C07C303/08, C07C309/31 (EP,US);
C07C6/04, C07C11/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOBASIERTE LINEARE ALKYLPHENYLSULFONATE | [2013/52] | English: | BIO-BASED LINEAR ALKYLPHENYL SULFONATES | [2013/52] | French: | SULFONATES D'ALKYLPHÉNYLE LINÉAIRES D'ORIGINE BIOLOGIQUE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 04.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 13.09.2017 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | IE | 17.02.2018 | LU | 17.02.2018 | MT | 17.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9905084 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [AD]WO2009140695 (LS9 INC [US], et al); | [AD]WO2010062958 (ELEVANCE RENEWABLE SCIENCES [US], et al); | [YD]US2010145086 (SCHRODI YANN [US], et al); | [YD]US2010191008 (OLSON EDWIN S [US]); | by applicant | US548744 | US2396278 | US2438091 | US2486921 | US2486922 | US2528378 | US2658072 | US3308067 | US3332880 | US3427342 | US3519570 | US3553139 | US3600319 | US3646015 | US3664961 | DE2335044 | US3885155 | US3893929 | US3929678 | US3944470 | US3959230 | US4000093 | US4033718 | US4062647 | US4101457 | US4111855 | US4133779 | US4140641 | US4201824 | US4240918 | US4261868 | US4287082 | US4291071 | US4305837 | US4316824 | EP0066915 | US4375416 | US4404115 | US4412934 | US4420644 | US4427884 | US4430243 | US4452717 | EP0111965 | EP0111984 | EP0112592 | US4462922 | US4470919 | US4483781 | EP0133354 | US4507219 | US4520214 | US4523048 | US4525524 | US4526709 | US4529525 | US4530780 | US4537706 | US4537707 | US4545941 | US4579681 | US4597898 | EP0193360 | US4618446 | EP0199405 | EP0200586 | US4634551 | US4639321 | US4647393 | US4648983 | US4655954 | US4659497 | EP0219048 | US4661280 | US4670179 | EP0225654 | US4681704 | US4690771 | US4695560 | US4702857 | US4711730 | US4721580 | US4728455 | US4744916 | US4751008 | US4753750 | US4761509 | EP0279134 | US4787989 | US4790856 | US4793943 | CN1032157 | EP0315126 | US4842758 | US4844821 | US4844824 | WO8908694 | US4871467 | US4873001 | US4877896 | US4891147 | US4891160 | US4900475 | WO9001815 | US4908150 | US4911852 | US4915854 | US4923635 | US4943397 | US4950424 | US4956447 | US4966723 | US4968451 | US4973841 | US5004556 | US5006273 | EP0422787 | US5017296 | US5021195 | WO9108281 | EP0457205 | US5082585 | US5102574 | US5104646 | WO9206154 | US5106609 | US5114606 | US5114611 | US5147576 | US5153161 | US5156773 | US5160655 | WO9219709 | US5194416 | US5196574 | WO9307263 | WO9307260 | EP0544490 | EP0544440 | EP0549271 | EP0549272 | US5227084 | US5230823 | US5245094 | US5244594 | US5246621 | US5246612 | US5250212 | EP0564250 | US5256779 | US5264143 | US5269974 | US5269960 | US5274147 | US5275753 | US5280117 | WO9401532 | US5284944 | US5288746 | EP0583534 | EP0583535 | EP0583536 | WO9404542 | US5298421 | US5304481 | EP0598170 | WO9411483 | EP0598973 | US5334793 | US5344771 | US5344997 | EP0619368 | WO9423009 | US5376310 | EP0633311 | US5415807 | US5422030 | US5427711 | US5431848 | US5431842 | US5438194 | US5442100 | US5445756 | WO9532272 | WO9601306 | WO9601889 | EP0694608 | WO9602490 | US5489392 | WO9603486 | WO9603481 | WO9603369 | GB2292155 | WO9604361 | WO9604360 | GB2292562 | US5496487 | BR9502668 | US5500154 | US5500137 | US5500138 | WO9609370 | EP0704522 | WO9610073 | WO9610072 | US5505866 | EP0705900 | US5512482 | EP0709449 | WO9612468 | WO9615308 | WO9617916 | US5531910 | WO9621715 | WO9622352 | NO963082L | US5540852 | WO9623048 | GB2297762 | GB2297761 | US5547476 | GB2297975 | WO9625482 | US5554587 | WO9627655 | US5559088 | WO9630583 | WO9630472 | WO9630471 | US5562847 | US5565422 | EP0737739 | EP0738778 | US5569645 | EP0739977 | WO9634938 | US5573697 | WO9635772 | US5576285 | US5576282 | EP0743280 | EP0743279 | WO9637652 | WO9637595 | WO9637592 | WO9637591 | WO9637589 | WO9637588 | US5580485 | WO9638531 | DE19623623 | EP0751210 | EP0751213 | EP0752466 | EP0752469 | WO9700930 | WO9700937 | WO9700936 | EP0753571 | EP0753569 | EP0753560 | EP0753559 | EP0753558 | EP0753557 | EP0753556 | US5595967 | EP0754749 | US5597936 | US5661299 | US5850022 | WO9905084 | US5932202 | US5942653 | WO0102324 | WO0146096 | US6514926 | EP1299080 | US6583096 | US6593285 | US2003135080 | US6602840 | US6627778 | US6855680 | WO2005042532 | US2005272134 | US2006079704 | US2006211905 | US2007002022 | WO2007010453 | US2007219521 | WO2007136873 | WO2007136752 | WO2007136762 | WO2008046106 | WO2008100251 | US2008221345 | WO2008113041 | WO2008119082 | US2008255328 | US2008293060 | WO2008147781 | WO2009009391 | WO2009020667 | US2009061493 | WO2009042950 | US2009124839 | WO2009079213 | WO2009085278 | US2009217568 | WO2009111672 | US2009232873 | US2009275097 | WO2009140695 | WO2009140696 | US7635794 | WO2009155086 | WO2010022090 | WO2010021711 | US7671224 | US7683224 | US2010071259 | WO2010034736 | WO2010042664 | US2010105955 | US2010105963 | WO2010062958 | WO2010062480 | US2010145086 | US2010160506 | WO2010075483 | US2010170826 | US2010191008 | US2010199548 | US2010221798 | US7977517 | US19850740446 | EP19940921505 |