EP2686138 - METHOD FOR ROTATING A ROTATABLE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagner Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH & Co. KG Birrenbachshöhe 70 53804 Much / DE | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEISS, Günter Gielsdorfer Weg 20a 53347 Alfter / DE | 02 /
LINSEL, Bernd Am Rosengarten 27 57080 Siegen / DE | 03 /
ANDRES, Günter Im Proffgarten 3 53804 Much / DE | 04 /
ZIMMER, Andreas Mondorfer Str. 24 53844 Troisdorf / DE | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2014/04] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12707582.8 | 06.03.2012 | [2016/23] | WO2012EP53797 | Priority number, date | DE20111013926 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011013926 | [2014/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012123284 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686138 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686138 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25B23/145, F15B15/06 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B25B21/005 (EP,US);
B25B23/1456 (EP,US);
F15B15/061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | B25B21/00, B25B23/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DREHEN EINES DREHBAREN TEILS | [2014/04] | English: | METHOD FOR ROTATING A ROTATABLE PART | [2014/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE TOURNER UNE PARTIE PIVOTANTE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2012 | AL | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | IT | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | MT | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | IE | 06.03.2017 | LU | 06.03.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2449638 (ANSON PAUL ANTHONY [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO03013797 (WAGNER PAUL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10222159 (WAGNER PAUL-HEINZ [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03013797 | DE10222159 |