EP2678443 - METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING HUMAN DNA USING AN INTERNAL CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qiagen GmbH Qiagen Strasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | For all designated states QIAGEN Manchester Limited Skelton House Lloyd Street North Manchester M15 6SH / GB | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI PASQUALE, Francesca Derendorfer Strasse 70 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ENGEL, Holger Käthe-Kollwitz-Weg 5 40724 Hilden / DE | 03 /
STRAUSS, Sascha Bahnstrasse 8-10 42697 Solingen / DE | 04 /
THELWELL, Nicola, Jo 21 Norfolk Street Glossop Derbyshire SK13 7QU / GB | [2016/47] |
Former [2014/01] | 01 /
DI PASQUALE, Francesca Derendorfer Strasse 70 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
ENGEL, Holger Käthe-Kollwitz-Weg 5 40724 Hilden / DE | |||
03 /
STRAU, Sascha Bahnstrasse 8-10 42697 Solingen / DE | |||
04 /
THELWELL, Nicola, Jo 21 Norfolk Street Glossop Derbyshire SK13 7QU / GB | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstrasse 29 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2014/01] | Fanelli Haag Kilger PLLC Fasanenstrasse 29 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12709012.4 | 20.02.2012 | [2016/47] | WO2012EP00833 | Priority number, date | EP20110155178 | 21.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11155178 | US201261588975P | 20.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261588975 P | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113577 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678443 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2678443 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6851 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6888 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6879 (US);
C12Q2525/151 (CN);
C12Q2545/101 (CN);
C12Q2561/113 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2525/151, C12Q2545/101, C12Q2561/113 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG MENSCHLICHER DNA MITTELS EINER INTERNEN KONTROLLE | [2016/18] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING HUMAN DNA USING AN INTERNAL CONTROL | [2014/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE QUANTIFICATION D'ADN HUMAIN AU MOYEN D'UN TÉMOIN INTERNE | [2014/01] |
Former [2014/01] | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG MENSCHLICHER DNA MITTELS EINER INTERNEN STEUERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2012 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | IE | 20.02.2017 | LU | 20.02.2017 | MT | 20.02.2017 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.02.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
MT | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.02.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
MT | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.02.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
MT | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.02.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
MT | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
MT | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
LU | 20.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0714987 (IMMUNO AG [AT]) [X] 17 * examples 1-3; claim 1 * [Y] 1,3-10 [I] 18; | [XI]WO03075837 (US ARMY MED RES MAT COMMAND [US], et al) [X] 17 * Examples * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0027] , [0070] * [I] 15,16,18; | [X]US2007134655 (BENTWICH ITZHAK [IL]) [X] 17,18 * sequences 191099,88031,185375,80049 *; | [XAI]WO2007126377 (VYTAL DIAGNOSTICS AB [SE], et al) [X] 17 * example 1 * [A] 2 [I] 18; | [XI]US7374927 (PALMA JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 17 * sequences 35254, 35262, 35667, 35668 * [I] 18; | [XYI] - NIEDERSTATTER ET AL, "A modular real-time PCR concept for determining the quantity and quality of human nuclear and mitochondrial DNA", 20070201, (20070201), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 29 - 34, XP005942483 [X] 17 * abstract * * Materials and methods; Results and discussion * [Y] 1,3-10 [I] 18 | [XYI] - SWANGO K L ET AL, "A quantitative PCR assay for the assessment of DNA degradation in forensic samples", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 158, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.FORSCIINT.2005.04.034, ISSN 0379-0738, (20060420), pages 14 - 26, (20060420), XP025086123 [X] 17 * abstract * [Y] 1,3-10 [I] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.forsciint.2005.04.034 | [ ] - "Sequence 35254 from patent US 7374927.", EMBL, (20080818), Database accession no. EA815487, URL: EBI [ ] * compound . * | [ ] - "Sequence 35262 from patent US 7374927.", EMBL, (20080818), Database accession no. EA815495, URL: EBI [ ] * compound . * | [ ] - "Sequence 35667 from patent US 7374927.", EMBL, (20080818), Database accession no. EA815900, URL: EBI [ ] * compound . * | [ ] - "Sequence 35668 from patent US 7374927.", EMBL, (20080818), Database accession no. EA815901, URL: EBI [ ] * compound . * | [Y] - P. H. SUDMANT ET AL, "Diversity of Human Copy Number Variation and Multicopy Genes", SCIENCE, (20101029), vol. 330, no. 6004, doi:10.1126/science.1197005, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 641 - 646, XP055003891 [Y] 1,3-10,12,14,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1197005 | [I] - "Homo sapiens cosmid clone XXcos-2185C13 from 7, complete sequence", EMBL, (20020227), XP002627315 [I] 11,13,18 * nts 16636-18635 * | [ ] - "Sequence 191099 from patent US 7618814.", EMBL, (20091225), Database accession no. GV191099, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "Sequence 88031 from patent US 7618814.", EMBL, (20091225), Database accession no. GV088031, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "Sequence 185375 from patent US 7618814.", EMBL, (20091225), Database accession no. GV185375, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "Sequence 80049 from patent US 7618814.", EMBL, (20091225), Database accession no. GV080049, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [I] - "Homo sapiens chromosome Y clone RP11-363H7, WORKING DRAFT SEQUENCE", Nucleotide, NCBI, (20000817), Database accession no. AC011304, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/nuccore, XP002677807 [I] 12,14 * Nucleotides 81696-81825 * | [Y] - KRENKE B E ET AL, "Developmental validation of a real-time PCR assay for the simultaneous quantification of total human and male DNA", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL: GENETICS, ELSEVIER BV, NETHERLANDS, vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.FSIGEN.2008.07.004, ISSN 1872-4973, (20081201), pages 14 - 21, (20081126), XP025694574 [Y] 1,3-10,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fsigen.2008.07.004 | [XI] - THELWELL N ET AL, "Mode of action and application of Scorpion primers to mutation detection", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH SPECIAL PUBLICATION, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20001001), vol. 28, no. 19, doi:10.1093/NAR/28.19.3752, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3752 - 3761, XP002247004 [X] 17 * abstract * [I] 15,16,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.19.3752 | [XI] - JAYNE A. BATES ET AL, "Scorpion ARMS primers for SNP real-time PCR detection and quantification of Pyrenophora teres", MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, (20010901), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.1046/j.1464-6722.2001.00074.x, ISSN 1464-6722, pages 275 - 280, XP055002650 [X] 17 * abstract * * page 275, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 279, column 2 * [I] 15,16,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1464-6722.2001.00074.x | [XYI] - PIERCE K E ET AL, "Real-time PCR using molecular beacons for accurate detection of the Y chromosome in single human blastomeres.", MOLECULAR HUMAN REPRODUCTION DEC 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:11101699, (200012), vol. 6, no. 12, ISSN 1360-9947, pages 1155 - 1164, XP002677808 [X] 17 * abstract * * page 1158, column 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1,3-10,12,14,19 [I] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/6.12.1155 | Examination | WO2012038503 | by applicant | US4458006 | US2009017453 | - LASALLE ET AL., "Analysis of Single and Multi-copy Methods for DNA Quantification by Real-Time Polymerase Chain Reaction", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL: GENETICS | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 1350 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - VINCENT ET AL., EMBO REP, (2004), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 795 - 800 | - AN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, no. 32, pages 28952 - 28958 | - WALKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1992), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1691 - 6 | - DEAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 5261 - 5266 | - LIU ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1996), vol. 118, pages 1587 - 1594 | - WANG ET AL., GENOME RES, (2004), vol. 14, pages 2357 - 2366 | - DAFFORN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2004), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 854 - 7 | - VUORINEN ET AL., J CLIN MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 33, pages 1856 - 1859 | - VAN NESS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 8, pages 4504 - 4509 | - NOTOMI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, no. 12, page E63 | - PIEPENBURG ET AL., PLOS BIOL, (2006), vol. 4, no. 7, pages 1115 - 1120 | - KIEVITS ET AL., J VIROL METHODS, (1991), vol. 35, pages 273 - 286 | - MITANI ET AL., NAT METHODS, (2007), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 257 - 62 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1862 |