EP2699151 - BASKET STYLE CARDIAC MAPPING CATHETER HAVING SPLINE BENDS FOR DETECTION OF CARDIAC RHYTHM DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topera, Inc. 1530 O'Brien Drive, Suite A Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Topera, Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORDIS, Thomas, F. C/o Topera Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 P.o. Box 224 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | 02 /
SEHRA, Ruchir C/o Topera Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 P.o. Box 224 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Eric, T. C/o Topera Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 P.o. Box 224 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | 04 /
RAGLAND, Robert, Ryan C/o Topera Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 P.o. Box 224 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | 05 /
KENT, Darrin, J. C/o Topera Inc. 11445 E. Via Linda Suite 2 P.o. Box 224 Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/09] | Application number, filing date | 12709740.0 | 01.03.2012 | [2015/48] | WO2012US27182 | Priority number, date | US201161478340P | 22.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161478340 P | US201161555190P | 03.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555190 P | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012145073 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699151 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699151 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/042 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/6858 (EP,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (US);
A61B5/6859 (US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2562/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | 21.11.2013 | ME | 21.11.2013 | Title | German: | KORBARTIGER KARDIALER MAPPING-KATHETER MIT RILLENBIEGUNGEN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON HERZRHYTHMUSSTÖRUNGEN | [2014/09] | English: | BASKET STYLE CARDIAC MAPPING CATHETER HAVING SPLINE BENDS FOR DETECTION OF CARDIAC RHYTHM DISORDERS | [2014/09] | French: | CATHÉTER DE MAPPAGE CARDIAQUE DE STYLE PANIER AYANT DES COURBURES DE CANNELURE POUR UNE DÉTECTION DE TROUBLES DE LA FRÉQUENCE CARDIAQUE | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2012 | AL | 25.11.2015 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | LU | 01.03.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.03.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.03.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.03.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.03.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9717892 (CARDIAC PATHWAYS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,22* page 12, line 36 - page 15, line 19; figure 22 *; | [XA]US6163716 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 57 - column 7, line 67 * * column 13, lines 62-65 * [A] 23-26; | [XA]US2009171274 (HARLEV DORON [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0050] - [0074]; figures 3A,3B,4D * [A] 22-26 | by applicant | US2011251505 | US20100342016 |