EP2691180 - ELECTRODE ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRODYNAMIC FRAGMENTATION PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states selFrag AG Biberenzelgli 18 3210 Kerzers / CH | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER-SIEBERT, Reinhard Wyttenbachstrasse 11 CH-3013 Bern / CH | 02 /
MONTI DI SOPRA, Fabrice Stöckliweg 10 CH-3604 Thun / CH | 03 /
HASLER, Bernhard Bahnhofstrasse 2 CH-4900 Langenthal / CH | 04 /
GIESE, Harald Etzelstrasse 17 76297 Stutensee / DE | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Münch, Martin Walter E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Münch, Martin Walter E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12709777.2 | 08.03.2012 | [2017/14] | WO2012CH00054 | Priority number, date | WO2011CH00066 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: PCT/CH2011/000066 | [2014/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012129713 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691180 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691180 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/18 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
B02C19/18 (EP,US);
B02C2019/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRODYNAMISCHE FRAGMENTIERUNGSANLAGE | [2014/06] | English: | ELECTRODE ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRODYNAMIC FRAGMENTATION PLANT | [2014/06] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLECTRODES POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE FRAGMENTATION ÉLECTRODYNAMIQUE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 07.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2012 | AL | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]FR1341851 (ENERTRON CORP) [X] 1-5,8,14,20,23,24 * the whole document * [A] 28 [I] 27; | [XAI]CN201105234Y (SHIYING YANG [CN]) [X] 1,3-5,8,23,24 * figure 1 * [A] 28 [I] 27; | [XAI]SU697188 (SHAMARIN YURIJ E [SU], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,23,24 * figure . * [A] 28 [I] 27; | [A]SU555226 (FROLOV) [A] 1,6,13,23,27,28 * figure . * | by applicant | DE19534232 | GB2342304 | JPH1133430 |