EP2676004 - PROXIMITY SENSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qinetiq Limited Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 OLX / GB | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Business Innovation & Skills 1 Victoria Street London SW1H 0ET / GB | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORTON, Thomas John QinetiQ Limited Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | 02 /
MANNING, Paul Antony QinetiQ Limited Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Alan QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Clarke, Alan QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road, Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12709956.2 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012GB00142 | Priority number, date | GB20110002542 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: GB 201102542 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110756 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676004 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04, G01B7/02 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G01B7/14 (EP,US);
F01D17/02 (EP,US);
F01D21/04 (EP,US);
G01B7/023 (EP,US);
F05D2270/80 (EP,US);
F05D2270/821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | NÄHERUNGSSENSORSYSTEM | [2013/52] | English: | PROXIMITY SENSOR SYSTEM | [2013/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DÉTECTEUR DE PROXIMITÉ | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2312958 (ROTADATA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,17 * page 6; figures 2,3 * [I] 2-16,18-20; | [X]US4847556 (LANGLEY LAWRENCE W [US]) [X] 1,17 * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 10 *; | [A]WO2009004319 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,17 * page 8, column 31 - page 9, column 7 * | by applicant | US5942893 | US4716366 | US4893079 | US7324908 | US4970670 | US6479990 | US7162384 | US7323868 | WO2009034305 |