EP2683383 - USE OF 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXOQUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)PIPERIDINE-2-6-DIONE IN TREATMENT OF IMMUNE-RELATED AND INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANDHI, Anita 37 Sterling Road Bernardsville, NJ 07924 / US | 02 /
SCHAFER, Peter, H. 126 John E. Busch Ave. Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2014/03] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Intellectual Property Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12710411.5 | 09.03.2012 | [2017/48] | WO2012US28538 | Priority number, date | US201161451995P | 11.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161451995 P | US201161480272P | 28.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161480272 P | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012125475 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2683383 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2683383 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61P37/00 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXOCHINAZOLIN-3 (4H) -YL) PIPERIDIN-2-6-DION BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON IMMUNBEDINGTEN UND ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2014/03] | English: | USE OF 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXOQUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)PIPERIDINE-2-6-DIONE IN TREATMENT OF IMMUNE-RELATED AND INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2014/03] | French: | UTILISATION DE 3-(5-AMINO-2-MÉTHYL-4-OXOQUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)PIPÉRIDINE-2-6-DIONE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIÉES AU SYSTÈME IMMUNITAIRE ET INFLAMMATOIRES | [2014/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2012 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IE | 09.03.2018 | LU | 09.03.2018 | MT | 09.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.03.2012 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.03.2012 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008039489 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [5.17] , [ 5.59]; claim 18 * | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5134127 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5639480 | US5674533 | US5733566 | US5739108 | US5891474 | US5922356 | US5972891 | US5980945 | US5993855 | US6045830 | US6087324 | US6113943 | US6197350 | US6248363 | US6264970 | US6267981 | US6376461 | WO0232925 | US6419961 | WO02088171 | US6589548 | US2003133939 | US6613358 | US6699500 | WO2005037989 | US2005238646 | WO2006055689 | US7635700 | - HACHULLA E; LAUNAY D, "Diagnosis and classification of systemic sclerosis", CLIN REV ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 78 - 83 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - "Systemic Lupus Erythematosus", HAHN BH, Harrison's Principles o_flnternal Medicine, MCGRAW-HILL, (2005), pages 1960 - 1967 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - AKHMETSHINA A. ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2009), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 219 - 224 | US20110451806 |