EP2683384 - METHODS OF TREATING CANCER USING 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-QUINAZOLIN-3-YL)-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, George, W. P.O. Box 3688 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
SCHAFER, Peter, H. 126 John E. Busch Ave. Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 03 /
MAN, Hon-Wah 27 Grant Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Ling-Hua 293 Morris Ave. Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US | 05 /
GANDHI, Anita 37 Sterling Road Bernardsville, NJ 07924 / US | 06 /
CHOPRA, Rajesh 54 Eggers Court Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2014/03] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12710836.3 | 09.03.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012US28498 | Priority number, date | US201161451995P | 11.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161451995 P | US201161480272P | 28.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161480272 P | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012125459 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2683384 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2683384 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61P35/00 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS MIT 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-CHINAZOLIN-3-YL)-PIPERIDIN-2,6-DION | [2015/22] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING CANCER USING 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-QUINAZOLIN-3-YL)-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE | [2014/03] | French: | METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER AU MOYEN DE 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-QUINAZOLIN-3-YL)-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE | [2015/22] |
Former [2014/03] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS MIT 3- (5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-CHINAZOLIN-3-YL) -PIPERIDIN-2,6-DION | ||
Former [2014/03] | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER AU MOYEN DE 3-(5-AMINO-2-METHYL-4-OXO-4H-QUINAZOLIN-3-YL)-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 23.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15197498.7 / EP3025715 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2016/27] |
Former [2016/25] | LV | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008039489 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-62* paragraphs [5.17] , [ 5.59]; claim 18 * | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US4810643 | US4999291 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5134127 | US5229496 | US5354556 | US5391485 | US5393870 | US5528823 | US5580755 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5674533 | US5733566 | WO0232925 | WO02088171 | US2003133939 | WO2005037989 | US2005238646 | WO2006055689 | US2008051379 | US7393862 | US7468363 | US7498171 | US7635700 | WO2010137547 | - JEMAL A ET AL., "Cancer Statistics, 2007", CA: A CANCER JOURNAL FOR CLINICIANS, (2007), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 43 - 66 | - CLARKE C A ET AL., CANCER, (2002), vol. 94, no. 7, pages 2015 - 2023 | - K. STAHNKE. ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, pages 3066 - 3073 | - D. KIM ET AL., "ASCO Annual Meeting Proceedings Part 1", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20070620), vol. 25, no. 18S, page 8082 | - The Merck Manual, (1999), pages 944 - 952 | - The Merck Manual, (1999), pages 946 - 949 | - The Merck Manual, (1999), pages 949 - 952 | - Cancer: Principles & Practice of Oncology, (1989), pages 1843 - 1847 | - CERNY T ET AL., ANN ONCOL, (2002), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 211 - 216 | - M. AKLILU ET AL., Annals of Oncology, (2004), vol. 15, pages 1109 - 1114 | - JENNIFER H. ANOLIK ET AL., CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (200702), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 139 - 145 | - CAIRNS, R.A. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 11, pages 85 - 95 | - SHACKELFORD, D.B.; SHAW, R.J., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2009), vol. 9, pages 563 - 575 | - MARDIS, E.R. ET AL., N. ENGF..J MED., (2009), vol. 361, pages 1058 - 1066 | - PARSONS, D.W. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 1807 - 1812 | - STOCKDALE, Medicine, (1998), vol. 3 | - GILMAN ET AL., Goodman and Gilman's: The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW HILL | - HIGGINS, J.J. ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2004), vol. 63, pages 1927 - I931 | - JO, S., NEUROCHEM, (2005), vol. 94, pages 1212 - 1224 | - HOHBERGER B. ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2009), vol. 583, pages 633 - 637 | - ANGERS S., NATURE, (2006), vol. 443, pages 590 - 593 | - ITO, T. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, pages 1345 - 1350 | - HANS ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 275 - 282 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (1995), vol. 172-178, pages 949 - 982 | - THERASSE ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST, (2000), vol. 92, pages 205 - 216 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - W ILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Re.solutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - PENICHET, M.L.; MORRISON, S.L., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 91 - 1011 | - EMENS, L.A. ET AL., CURR. OPINION MOL. THER., (2001), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 77 - 84 | - "Response Evaluation Criteria in Solid Tumors (RECIST) Guidelines", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (2000), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 205 - 216 | - CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 380 | US20110451806 |