EP2695358 - SELECTION OF SERVICE NODES FOR PROVISION OF SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states British Telecommunications PLC 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBRIDGE, Trevor PP: C5A 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | 02 /
SOPPERA, Andrea PP : C5A 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Geffen, Nigel Paul, et al British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department, PP:C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12711203.5 | 16.03.2012 | [2018/16] | WO2012GB00246 | Priority number, date | EP20110250415 | 01.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11250415 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012131287 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695358 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695358 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/701, H04L12/911, H04L29/08, H04L29/12 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L67/1021 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | H04L29/08, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHL VON SERVICE KNOTEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN | [2017/51] | English: | SELECTION OF SERVICE NODES FOR PROVISION OF SERVICES | [2014/07] | French: | SÉLECTION DE NOEUD DE SERVICE POUR LA MISE À DISPOSITION DES SERVICES | [2017/51] |
Former [2014/07] | AUSWAHL VON DIENSTKNOTEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN | ||
Former [2014/07] | SÉLECTION DE N UDS DE SERVICES POUR LA FOURNITURE DE SERVICES | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2012 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.03.2012 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US7228359 (MONTEIRO ANTHONY J [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1 - column 10; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2010161799 (MALOO SUNIL [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US7228359 | US2010161799 |