EP2686049 - INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSEMANN, Michael Cambridge Consultants Ltd. 29 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB40DW / GB | 02 /
PHILLIPS, Desmond Cambridge Consultants Ltd. 29 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB40DW / GB | 03 /
RAMBLE, David Cambridge Consultants Ltd. 29 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB40DW / GB | 04 /
REYNOLDS, Sean Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham, Sussex RH125AB / GB | 05 /
VERNON-HARCOURT, Edward Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham, Sussex RH125AB / GB | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Stuttle, James Henry Phillip, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/04] | Bone, Alexander Marcus Thomas Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12711598.8 | 13.03.2012 | WO2012EP54371 | Priority number, date | US201161452763P | 15.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161452763 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012123448 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686049 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686049 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0035 (EP,US);
A61M15/0041 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/332 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALATOR | [2014/04] | English: | INHALER | [2014/04] | French: | INHALATEUR | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 14.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14198936.8 / EP2865403 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2012 | AL | 04.03.2015 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | LU | 13.03.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 13.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 13.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009075794 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007101438 (BANG & OLUFSEN MEDICOM AS [DK], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1898977 (LETCAT AKTIEBOLAG [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2398065 (BESPAK PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005113042 |