EP2683321 - PROSTHETIC DEVICE COMPRISING A DENTAL IMPLANT, AND RELATED POSITIONING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guez, Eric 140 avenue Victor Hugo 75116 Paris / FR | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12712328.9 | 06.03.2012 | WO2012FR50457 | Priority number, date | FR20110000739 | 11.03.2011 Original published format: FR 1100739 | [2014/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012123661 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2683321 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
A61C8/0022 (EP);
A61C8/0018 (EP);
A61C8/0024 (EP);
A61C8/0025 (EP);
A61C8/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Title | German: | PROTHETISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM ZAHNIMPLANTAT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/03] | English: | PROSTHETIC DEVICE COMPRISING A DENTAL IMPLANT, AND RELATED POSITIONING METHOD | [2014/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF PROTHETIQUE COMPORTANT UN IMPLANT DENTAIRE ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN PLACE ASSOCIE | [2014/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2010106251 (TEKKA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-8 * page 9, line 13 - page 11, line 22; figures 12, 14, 23 * * page 17, lines 18-22 * * page 19, lines 3-29; claim 3 *; | [A]DE10356920 (LIPPE RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] *; | [A]WO2004103202 (FROMOVICH OPHIR [IL], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 23 - page 9, line 10; figure - * * page 14, line 4 - page 15, line 22 * * page 16, lines 14-19 *; | [A]FR2929102 (FROMENTAL ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE102008019489 (SDS SWISS DENTAL SOLUTIONS AG [LI]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | FR2943240 |