EP2683297 - VISUALIZATION KIT CONTAINING A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE AND CO-FUMIGATION PROCESS OF A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/03] | EXPOSURE KIT INCLUDING A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE, AND METHOD FOR THE CO-FUMIGATION OF A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE | ||
[2016/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crime Science Technology 235 avenue de la Recherche 59120 Loos / FR | For all designated states Ecole Normale Supérieure de Cachan 61 Avenue du Président Wilson 94230 Cachan / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states Crime Science Technology 235 avenue de la Recherche 59120 Loos / FR | ||
For all designated states Ecole Normale Superieure De Cachan 61 Avenue du Président Wilson 94230 Cachan / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Crime Scene Technology 2b 21 allée du Cercle 59650 Villeneuve D'ascq / FR | ||
For all designated states Ecole Normale Superieure De Cachan 61 Avenue du Président Wilson 94230 Cachan / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRETE, Cosimo 2B 21 Allée du Cercle F-59650 Villeneuve D'ascq / FR | 02 /
AUDEBERT, Pierre c/o PPSM UMR 8531 CNRS Ecole Normale Supérieure de Cachan 61 avenue du Président Wilson F-94235 Cachan Cédex / FR | 03 /
GALMICHE, Laurent c/o PPSM UMR 8531 CNRS Ecole Normale Supérieure de Cachan 61 avenue du Président Wilson F-94235 Cachan Cédex / FR | 04 /
ALLAIN, Clémence c/o PPSM UMR 8531 CNRS Ecole Normale Supérieure de Cachan 61 avenue du Président Wilson F-94235 Cachan Cédex / FR | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2014/03] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12712332.1 | 06.03.2012 | [2017/07] | WO2012FR50462 | Priority number, date | FR20110051828 | 07.03.2011 Original published format: FR 1151828 | [2014/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012120234 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2683297 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2683297 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, C07D403/04, C07D257/08, G01N21/64 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
C07D257/08 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61B5/1172 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | A61B5/117, C07D403/04, C07D257/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDES MITTEL UND CYANACRYLAT ENTHALTENDES NACHWEISKIT, VERFAHREN ZUM MITBEGASSEN EINES FLUORESZIERENDEN MITTEL UND EINES CYANOACRYLATES | [2016/28] | English: | VISUALIZATION KIT CONTAINING A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE AND CO-FUMIGATION PROCESS OF A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE | [2016/28] | French: | TROUSSE DE REVELATION COMPRENANT UN AGENT FLUORESCENT ET UN CYANOACRYLATE, PROCEDE DE CO-FUMIGATION D'UN AGENT FLUORESCENT ET D'UN CYANOACRYLATE | [2014/03] |
Former [2014/03] | EXPOSITIONSKIT MIT EINER FLUORESZIERENDEN SUBSTANZ UND EINEM CYANOACRYLAT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN BEGASUNG EINER FLUORESZIERENDEN SUBSTANZ UND EINES CYANOACRYLATS | ||
Former [2014/03] | EXPOSURE KIT INCLUDING A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE, AND METHOD FOR THE CO-FUMIGATION OF A FLUORESCENT AGENT AND A CYANOACRYLATE | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2012 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | IE | 06.03.2017 | LU | 06.03.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4504408 (MORTON WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 60; claim - *; | [XA]WO2008020951 (ARMOR HOLDINGS FORENSICS L L C [US]) [X] 1,2,7-15 * page 5, paragraph 2; claim - * [A] 3-6; | [L] - TANIUCHI ET AL, "ENZYMATIC FORMATION OF CATECHOL FROM ANTHRANILIC ACID.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19640701), vol. 239, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2204 - 2211, XP055027764 [L] 1 * page 2207, column r, line 38 - line 40 * | [L] - THERALD MOELLER ET AL, "Analytical Applications of 8-Hydroxyquinoline Derivatives of Gallium and Thallium", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19500501), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1021/ac60041a020, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 686 - 690, XP055027760 [L] 1 * page 688, column l, line 10 - line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60041a020 | [A] - GONG Y-H ET AL, "Synthesis and Physical Chemistry of s-Tetrazines: Which Ones are Fluorescent and Why?", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, WILEY-VCH, WEINHEIM; DE, (20091030), vol. 2009, no. 35, doi:DOI:10.1002/EJOC.200900964, ISSN 1434-193X, pages 6121 - 6128, XP002633987 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/EJOC.200900964 | [A] - GILLES CLAVIER ET AL, "s -Tetrazines as Building Blocks for New Functional Molecules and Molecular Materials", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (20100609), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1021/cr900357e, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 3299 - 3314, XP055001208 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr900357e | [A] - S. MORITOMO ET AL., "A new method to enhance visualization of latent fingermarks by sublimating dyes...", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL., ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS IRELAND LTD., (1998), vol. 97, ISSN 0379-0738, pages 101 - 108, XP002644449 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |