EP2831683 - FAIL SAFE DISCOVERY AND ADDRESS ASSIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULTON, Temple L. 1508 Stateline Road Elizabethton, Tennessee 37643 / US | 02 /
HOEDL, Peter Berliner Ring 7/2/6 A-8047 Graz / AT | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12712498.0 | 26.03.2012 | WO2012US30541 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013147734 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831683 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, H04L29/12 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/058 (EP,CN);
H04L61/5038 (EP,CN);
G05B2219/1113 (EP,CN);
G05B2219/15072 (EP,CN);
H04L61/5046 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | G05B19/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | AUSFALLSICHERE ERKENNUNG UND ADRESSZUORDNUNG | [2015/06] | English: | FAIL SAFE DISCOVERY AND ADDRESS ASSIGNMENT | [2015/06] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE À SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRÉE ET ATTRIBUTION D'ADRESSE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.08.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 27.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006093929 (BLADE NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 3,18,43* page 9, line 16 - page 11, line 15; figures 2,6 *; | [XY]US2008155073 (SWAIN TUSHARA K [IN]) [X] 1,2,4,10,14,16,19,26-29,35,39,41,44,51 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0060]; figures 6,7 * [Y] 3,18,43 |