EP2686080 - ILLUMINATED BALLOON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seatriever International Holdings Limited Unit 9 Cheshire Business Park Cheshire Avenue Lostock Gralam Northwich Cheshire CW9 7UA / GB | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Seatriever International Holdings Limited Unit 9 Mallory House Goostry Way Mobberley Cheshire WA16 7GY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLIBURTON, James The Coach House Narrow Lane Crewe Green Crewe Cheshire CW1 5UN / GB | 02 /
RHOADES, Tony 44 Hawthorn Road Hale Altrincham Cheshire WA15 9RG / GB | 03 /
TISDALL, Sean 37 Newboult Road Cheadle Cheshire SK8 2AH / GB | 04 /
BISHOP, James The Holly Tree Shenley Hill Road Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 3BT / GB | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/07] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2014/04] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12712710.8 | 15.03.2012 | WO2012GB50568 | Priority number, date | GB20110004442 | 16.03.2011 Original published format: GB 201104442 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012123747 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686080 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686080 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2686080 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63H27/10 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A63H27/10 (EP,GB,US);
B64B1/40 (EP,GB,US);
A63H2027/1058 (EP,GB,US);
B64D2203/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2014/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTETER BALLON | [2014/04] | English: | ILLUMINATED BALLOON | [2014/04] | French: | BALLON ÉCLAIRÉ | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 11.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.12.2014 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | RS | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | LU | 15.03.2015 | NO | 17.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2008110832 (MELLOWGRAPHIC LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 19 - line 27; figure - *; | [A]US5947581 (SCHRIMMER MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 6 - line 60; figure - *; | [A]US2008032589 (SUN DE-HONG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015]; figure - *; | [A]US2004127138 (HUANG CHUNG-TAO [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013]; figure - *; | [A]CN201684419U (ZHIQING HU) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008110832 |