EP2691995 - THERMOELECTRIC ASSEMBLY AND DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR GENERATING AN ELECTRIC CURRENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLE, Gérard 13 rue de la Charnie F-53270 Thorigné-en-Charnie / FR | 02 /
BOISSELLE, Patrick 85 rue du Vol de Bootz F-53000 Laval / FR | 03 /
MONNET, Véronique 4 Impasse des Teinturiers F-53810 Change / FR | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Neuviale, Bertrand, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA L'Agiot 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Delplanque, Arnaud Valeo Systemes Thermiques THS - Service Propriété Industrielle TCC 8 rue Louis Lormand B.P. 517 - La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Application number, filing date | 12713108.4 | 29.03.2012 | WO2012EP55743 | Priority number, date | FR20110052699 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: FR 1152699 | [2014/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012131012 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691995 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/30, H01L35/32 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
H10N10/13 (EP,US);
H10N10/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | THERMOELEKTRISCHE ANORDNUNG UND VORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2014/06] | English: | THERMOELECTRIC ASSEMBLY AND DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR GENERATING AN ELECTRIC CURRENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET DISPOSITIF THERMO ÉLECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT DESTINÉ À GÉNÉRER UN COURANT ÉLECTRIQUE DANS UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 29.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0119502 (AIR IND [FR]); | [A]JP2000356409 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO0124599 (ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHEST [RU], et al); | [XI]WO2007026432 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | US3196620 | US4802929 | US2010031987 |