EP2681137 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE DEFINED INTERMEDIATE STORAGE AND PICKING OF PRODUCED ARTICLES OF THE SAME TYPE BUT DIFFERENT SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grenzebach Maschinenbau GmbH Albanusstrasse 1-3 86663 Asbach-Baeumenheim / DE | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Hans-Peter Ludwigshafenerstrasse 21e 76187 Karlsruhe / DE | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Kindermann, Peter, et al Patentanwalte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | ||
Former [2014/02] | Karl, Frank Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 100234 85593 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 12714549.8 | 29.02.2012 | WO2012DE00210 | Priority number, date | DE20111012950 | 03.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011012950 | [2014/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012116690 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681137 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681137 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP,US);
B65G1/1375 (US);
B65G2201/0273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DEFINIERTEN ZWISCHENLAGERN UND KOMMISSIONIEREN PRODUZIERTER WAREN GLEICHER ART ABER UNTERSCHIEDLICHER GRÖSSE | [2014/02] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE DEFINED INTERMEDIATE STORAGE AND PICKING OF PRODUCED ARTICLES OF THE SAME TYPE BUT DIFFERENT SIZE | [2014/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LE STOCKAGE INTERMÉDIAIRE DÉFINI ET LA PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES DE PRODUITS DE MÊME TYPE MAIS DE TAILLE DIFFÉRENTE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2012 | AL | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | RS | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 29.02.2012 | |
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4538950 (SHIOMI TADATAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-14 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH0686470 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [A] 1,3,9* abstract *; | [Y]EP1535864 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008131255 (HESSLER TOMMY AXEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-14 * page 2, paragraph 24 - page 6, paragraph 48 * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US4538950 | JPH0686470 | DE69622116T | DE60104926T | EP1535864 | US2008131255 |