EP2676018 - DRIVETRAIN WITH SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND TURBOCOMPOUND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIGLER, Thomas Fronbergstrasse 12 74564 Crailsheim / DE | 02 /
KLEY, Markus Dürerstrasse 7 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 03 /
WUNSCH, Alexander Buchhofsteige 66 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12714555.5 | 10.02.2012 | WO2012EP00602 | Priority number, date | DE20111011637 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011011637 | [2013/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110217 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676018 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/013, F02B37/04, F02B41/10, F02B37/18, F02B37/00, F02M25/07 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
F02B37/004 (EP);
F02B37/013 (EP);
F02B37/04 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
F02B41/10 (EP);
F02B29/0425 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG MIT AUFGELADENEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND TURBOCOMPOUNDSYSTEM | [2013/52] | English: | DRIVETRAIN WITH SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND TURBOCOMPOUND SYSTEM | [2013/52] | French: | CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE DOTÉE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE SURALIMENTÉ ET SYSTÈME TURBOCOMPOUND | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 29.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3807372 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 37; figure 4 *; | [A]US2009241540 (ROBEL WADE J [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP2053208 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH06229253 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0091139 |