EP2695414 - MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12714867.4 | 16.03.2012 | WO2012JP57664 | Priority number, date | GB20110005693 | 04.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105693 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137615 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695414 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W88/06 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H04W72/1215 (GB);
H04L5/0032 (US);
H04W24/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2014/07] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2014/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | GB1105693 |