EP2694897 - A REFRIGERATOR AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A REFRIGERATOR | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZER, Stefan Spritzenhausplatz 12 73430 Aalen / DE | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 12714999.5 | 02.04.2012 | WO2012EP55975 | Priority number, date | DE20111006951 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011006951 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012136630 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2694897 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694897 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25B2600/0251 (EP);
F25D2700/02 (EP);
F25D2700/12 (EP);
F25D2700/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN KÄLTEGERÄT UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES KÄLTEGERÄTS | [2015/10] | English: | A REFRIGERATOR AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE REFRIGERATOR | [2015/10] | French: | APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE ET UN PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE l'APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/07] | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINES KÄLTEGERÄTS | ||
Former [2014/07] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A REFRIGERATOR | ||
Former [2014/07] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'UN APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 10.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2012 | AL | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | RS | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | GB | 02.04.2016 | IE | 02.04.2016 | LU | 02.04.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]DE102009001678 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [XD] 1,6,10-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-5,7-9; | [A]EP1524484 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 17] *; | [A]US6216478 (KANG KWANG HWA [KR]) [A] 1-12 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-4B *; | [A]US4292813 (PADDOCK STEPHEN W) [A] 1-12 * column 3 - column 9; figures 1,4,5 * | by applicant | DE102009001678 |