EP2694424 - STRADDLE CARRIER DEVICE COMPRISING ELECTRIC DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terex MHPS GmbH Forststrasse 16 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Gottwald Port Technology GmbH Forststrasse 16 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESCHEMANN, Armin Antoniestraße 66 46119 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
HEGEWALD, Mike Am Mönchgraben 7 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MOUTSOKAPAS, Jannis Offenbachweg 25 40789 Monheim / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
WIESCHEMANN, Armin Antoniestraße 66 46119 Oberhausen / DE | ||
02 /
HEGEWALD, Mike Waisenhausstraße 58 46117 Oberhausen / DE | |||
03 /
MOUTSOKAPAS, Jannis Offenbachweg 25 40789 Monheim / DE | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2014/07] | Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12715020.9 | 03.04.2012 | WO2012EP56094 | Priority number, date | DE20111001847 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011001847 | DE20111054209 | 05.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011054209 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136667 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694424 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694424 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66C19/00, B66C13/12 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B66C19/00 (KR);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
B66C13/12 (EP,KR,US);
B66C19/007 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORTALHUBGERÄT MIT ELEKTRISCHEN ANTRIEBEN | [2014/07] | English: | STRADDLE CARRIER DEVICE COMPRISING ELECTRIC DRIVES | [2014/07] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLÉVATEUR À PORTIQUE À ENTRAÎNEMENTS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 29.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2012 | AL | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2007143841 (RAILPOWER TECHNOLOGIES CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 10, lines 20-21 * * page 14, lines 16-17 * * page 14, lines 3-11 * * page 12, lines 5-8 * * page 15, line 26 - page 16, line 12 * * page 17, lines 4-6 * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 3,4,10,11 [I] 8,9; | [XPAI]EP2354075 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0007] * * figure 2 * [A] 3,4,10,11 [I] 8,9; | [Y]JP2008156047 (TADANO ENG KK, et al) [Y] 3,4 * figure 3 *; | [A]US6155770 (WARHURST PETER S [US]) [A] 3,4 * figure 11 *; | [Y]EP2281769 (CARGOTEC FINLAND OY [FI]) [Y] 11 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102008011539 (NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10 * claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2009150303 | DE202004018066U |