EP2699403 - MODIFIED INJECTION MOLDING UNIT AND METHOD OF DELIVERING COOLED MOLDING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Inc. 1800 W. Center Street Warsaw IN 46580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Zimmer, Inc. 1800 West Center Street Warsaw IN 46580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIMNAUGH, Brion R. 2871 N 400 E Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US | 02 /
WALLICK, Michael 2372 S. Talley-Ho Circle Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, Brian H. 6093 E. Old Tr. Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12715797.2 | 11.04.2012 | WO2012US33110 | Priority number, date | US201161474353P | 12.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161474353 P | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012142152 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2699403 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/78, B29B13/04, B29C45/18, B29C45/74, B29C45/62 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B29C45/18 (EP,US);
B29B13/045 (EP,US);
B29C45/62 (EP,US);
B29C45/74 (EP,US);
B29C45/78 (EP,US);
B29C2945/7604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE SPRITZGIESSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINES GEKÜHLTEN FORMMATERIALS | [2014/09] | English: | MODIFIED INJECTION MOLDING UNIT AND METHOD OF DELIVERING COOLED MOLDING MATERIAL | [2014/09] | French: | UNITÉ DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION MODIFIÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE MATÉRIAU DE MOULAGE REFROIDI | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 03.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4178337 (HALL JOSEPH J [US], et al) [Y] 3,7,9,10,16-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 23 * * column 5, line 9 - line 27 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 4 * [A] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15; | [XY]GB1599276 (CAMERON PRICE LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-6 *[Y] 3,7,9,10,16-20; | [XY]JPS61235120 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 3,7,9,10,16-20; | [XY]JPH08156062 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [00 5] * [Y] 3,7,9,10,16-20; | [XY]GB2366640 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15 * abstract * * page 2 - page 3 * * page 3, column 3 * [Y] 3,7,9,10,16-20 | Examination | US2151476 | GB2366540 |