EP2697391 - METHOD AND PRODUCT FOR LOCALISED OR SPATIAL DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACID IN A TISSUE SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spatial Transcriptomics AB Södra Fiskartorpsvägen 15 C 114 33 Stockholm / SE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Spatial Transcriptomics AB Bragevagen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Spatial Transcriptomics AB Bragevagen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISEN, Jonas Bragevägen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
STÅHL, Patrik Fatburstrappan 18 T3:1 118 26 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
LUNDEBERG, Joakim Torsvikssvän 20 181 34 Lidingö / SE | [2019/44] |
Former [2014/08] | 01 /
FRISEN, Jonas Bragevägen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
STAHL, Patrik Fatburstrappan 18 T3:1 118 26 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
LUNDEBERG, Joakim Torsvikssvän 20 181 34 Lidingö / SE | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2014/08] | Wilkins, Christopher George Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12715934.1 | 13.04.2012 | [2019/44] | WO2012EP56823 | Priority number, date | GB20110006254 | 13.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201106254 | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012140224 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2697391 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2697391 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6841 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12Q1/6837 (CN,RU,US);
C12Q1/6806 (KR,US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12Q1/6816 (US);
C12Q1/682 (US);
C12Q1/6827 (US);
C12Q1/6844 (CN,RU,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
G01N1/30 (US);
G01N1/42 (US);
G16B30/00 (US);
G16B50/20 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2565/537 (CN,US);
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2565/537 (EP);
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2565/537 (US,CN);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2565/537 (US,CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PRODUKT ZUR LOKALISIERTEN ODER RÄUMLICHEN ERKENNUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN IN EINER GEWEBEPROBE | [2014/08] | English: | METHOD AND PRODUCT FOR LOCALISED OR SPATIAL DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACID IN A TISSUE SAMPLE | [2014/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT POUR LA DÉTECTION LOCALISÉE OU SPATIALE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON DE TISSU | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 07.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19204655.5 / EP3677692 | EP22200443.4 / EP4183887 | EP22208440.2 / EP4206333 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2012 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | IE | 13.04.2020 | LU | 13.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.04.2012 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 13.04.2020 | ||
LU | 13.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 13.04.2020 | ||
LU | 13.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 13.04.2020 | ||
LU | 13.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003040035 (SLAMON DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * abstract * * claims 1-19 *; | [A]US2006211001 (YU JINGWEI [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * abstract * * claims 1,5-6,13-14 *; | [A]WO2007030373 (ST JUDE CHILDRENS RES HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * abstract *; | [X] - "Human Genome U95Av2", INTERNET CITATION, (20021002), URL: http://www.affymetrix.com, (20021002), XP002215481 [X] 37-41 * abstract * | [X] - "GeneChip Human Genome U133 Set", INTERNET CITATION, (20030226), URL: http://www.affymetrix.com/support/technical/datasheets/hgu133_datasheet.pdf, (20030226), XP002232760 [X] 37-41 * abstract * | [X] - CONSTANTINE L ET AL, "Use of genechip high-density oligonucleotide arrays for gene expression monitoring", LIFE SCIENCE NEWS, AMERSHAM LIFE SCIENCE, US, (19980101), ISSN 0969-0190, pages 11 - 14, XP002964122 [X] 37-41 * abstract * | [A] - EGUILUZ C ET AL, "Multitissue array review: A chronological description of tissue array techniques, applications and procedures", PATHOLOGY RESEARCH AND PRACTICE, GUSTAV FISCHER, STUTTGART, DE, vol. 202, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.PRP.2006.04.003, ISSN 0344-0338, (20060810), pages 561 - 568, (20060810), XP028031005 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.prp.2006.04.003 | [A] - SIEVERTZON MARIA ET AL, "Transcriptome analysis in primary neural stem cells using a tag cDNA amplification method", BMC NEUROSCIENCE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20050415), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2202-6-28, ISSN 1471-2202, page 28, XP021002918 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2202-6-28 | [AD] - WANG D ET AL, "Single cell analysis: the new frontier in 'omics'", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0167-7799, (20100601), pages 281 - 290, (20100521), XP027059906 [AD] 1-43 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHENA M ET AL, "QUANTITATIVE MONITORING OF GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS WITH A COMPLEMENTARY DNAMICROARRAY", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19951020), vol. 270, no. 5235, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.270.5235.467, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 467 - 470, XP000644675 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5235.467 | [A] - WILLI-MONNERAT ET AL, "Comprehensive spatiotemporal transcriptomic analyses of the ganglionic eminences demonstrate the uniqueness of its caudal subdivision", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR NEUROSCIENCES, SAN DIEGO, US, (20080126), vol. 37, no. 4, ISSN 1044-7431, pages 845 - 856, XP022576911 [A] 1-43 * abstract * | Examination | - Yong Woo ET AL, "A comparison of cDNA, oligonucleotide, and Affymetrix GeneChip gene expression microarray platforms", Journal of biomolecular techniques : JBT, United States, (20041201), page 276, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2291701/pdf/0150276.pdf, XP055539187 | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US4800159 | US4965188 | US5512462 | - TANG F ET AL., NAT PROTOC., (2010), vol. 5, pages 516 - 35 | - WANG D; BODOVITZ S, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 28, pages 281 - 90 | - SCHENA M ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 368 - 9,371 | - PETTERSON E ET AL., GENOMICS, (2009), vol. 93, pages 105 - 11 | - WADE CM ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 326, pages 865 - 7 | - RUBIN J ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 464, pages 587 - 91 | - ANDERSSON ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (20060906), vol. 54, no. 12, pages 1413 - 23 | - BARNES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 2216 - 2220 | - PERLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5577 - 5581 | - LUNDBERG ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 108, pages 1 - 6 |