EP2694574 - BIODEGRADABLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Stephen c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 02 /
FROHLICH, Leo c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 03 /
BARKER, Paul c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 04 /
CHAPALAIN, Florian c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 05 /
COWTON, Lucy c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 06 /
MEEK, Christopher Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | 07 /
HEWITT, Jonathan c/o Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis, et al TL Brand & Co 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12716548.8 | 05.04.2012 | WO2012GB50778 | Priority number, date | GB20110005994 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105994 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137014 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694574 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B65D65/46 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
C08J7/052 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B32B23/08 (EP,GB);
B05D1/30 (US);
B05D1/305 (KR,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/154 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/28 (US);
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B9/045 (EP);
B65D65/42 (US);
B65D65/466 (GB);
C08J7/04 (GB);
C08J7/0427 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,GB,KR);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2317/18 (GB);
B32B2317/20 (GB,KR);
B32B2367/00 (GB,KR);
B32B2435/00 (GB);
B32B2553/00 (EP);
B65D2565/387 (GB);
C08J2300/16 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C08J2301/02 (EP,GB,US);
C08J2400/16 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C08J2467/00 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C08L2201/06 (GB);
C08L67/04 (GB);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1307 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE FOLIE | [2014/07] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE FILM | [2014/07] | French: | FILM BIODÉGRADABLE | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9515260 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al); | [XD]WO9901278 (UPM KYMMENE OYJ [FI], et al); | [AD]EP2141191 (AMCOR FLEXIBLES TRANSPAC NV [BE]) | by applicant | WO9901278 | WO0001530 | US2007184220 | WO2009024812 | WO2009064942 | EP2141191 |