EP2678297 - CHRYSOPHAENTIN ANALOGS THAT INHIBIT FTSZ PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Msc 7600 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institues of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Msc 7600 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | ||
For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center O'Hara & Thackeray Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEWLEY, Carole A. 7711 Winterberry Place Bethesda MD 20817 / US | 02 /
WIPF, Peter 4628 Bayard Street, Apt. 404 Pittsburgh PA 15213 / US | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12716754.2 | 24.02.2012 | WO2012US26438 | Priority number, date | US201161446978P | 25.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161446978 P | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012116254 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2678297 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C15/50, C07C17/266, C07C25/24, C07C41/05, C07C43/275, C07C43/285, C07C43/295, A61K31/085 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/085 (EP,US);
C07C37/14 (US);
A61K31/055 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C07C39/373 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | CHRYSOPHAENTIN-ANALOGA ALS HEMMER DES FTSZ-PROTEINS | [2014/01] | English: | CHRYSOPHAENTIN ANALOGS THAT INHIBIT FTSZ PROTEIN | [2014/01] | French: | ANALOGUES DE CHRYSOPHAENTINE QUI INHIBENT LA PROTÉINE FTSZ | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA] - F. HUBALEK ET AL, "Demonstration of Isoleucine 199 as a Structural Determinant for the Selective Inhibition of Human Monoamine Oxidase B by Specific Reversible Inhibitors", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050401), vol. 280, no. 16, doi:10.1074/jbc.M500949200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15761 - 15766, XP055027610 [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2,6-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M500949200 | [A] - KATHLEEN ENGLAND ET.AL., "Substituted diphenyl etheres as a broad-spectrum platform for the development of chemotherapeutics for the treatment of tularaemia", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (20090904), vol. 64, pages 1052 - 1061, XP002676376 [A] 1,2,5-27 * page 1053, left column paragraph 3 - right column, paragraph 1; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JAC/DKP307 | by applicant | US4738851 | US4882150 | US4921475 | US5008110 | US5077033 | US5087240 | US5088977 | US5164189 | US5163899 | US5254346 | US5290561 | US5332213 | US5336168 | US5352456 | US5403841 | US5407713 | US5521222 | US5698219 | US5776445 | US5800807 | US6056950 | US6197934 | US6261547 | - BI ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, no. 3-5, pages 161 - 164 | - BURNS, NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 121 - 123 | - ERICKSON, TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 8, pages 133 - 137 | - JORDAN ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2004), vol. 4, page 253 | - "General Principles", FINGL; WOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, PAGAMONON PRESS, page 1 46 | - MOHAMADI ET AL., J. COMPUT. CHEM., (1990), vol. 11, page 440 | - ARNOLD ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2006), vol. 22, page 195 | - CORDELL ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 101, page 11821 | - PLAZA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2010), vol. 132, no. 26, pages 9069 - 9077 | - LEWIS; BRYAN, AM. J. BOT., (1941), vol. 28, page 343 | - GERWICK, J. NAT. PROD., (1989), vol. 52, page 252 | - WRIGHT ET AL., I. AM. CHEM. ,SOC., (2008), vol. 130, pages 16786 - 16790 | - BLOOMER ET AL., ORG. CHERM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 7906 - 7912 | - BLOOMER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 7906 - 7912 | - BLOOMER ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, pages 1201 - 1204 | - SNYDER ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CLZEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2007), vol. 46, pages 8186 - 8191 | - SNYDER ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2007), vol. 46, pages 8186 - 8191 | - WANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 45, pages 44424 - 44428 | - OLSON ET AL., PLOS PATHOGENS, vol. 7, no. 2, (2011), page E1001287, URL: www.plospathogens.org |