EP2678091 - AIR FILTER CARTRIDGES; COMPONENTS THEREOF; AND, AIR CLEANER ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | [2022/49] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Shigeo 3-21-1-709 Funabahsi Setagagya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | 02 /
YAO, Hajime 1-40-32 Naritahigashi Suginami Tokyo 166-0015 / JP | 03 /
KAWABE, Yota 1-87 Nishiki-cho, Tachikawa-shi Tokyo 190-0022 / JP | 04 /
KUWABARA, Yutaka 1868-9 Hashie-Machi Isesaki City 372-0001 / JP | 05 /
TESHIGAWARA, Junich 395-2 Motogi-Machi Maebashi City 371-0232 / JP | 06 /
YANADA, Shugo 3049-31 Tsunatori-cho Isesaki City 372-0812 / JP | [2014/10] |
Former [2014/03] | 01 /
KATO, Shigeo 3-21-1-709 Funabahsi Setagagya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | ||
02 /
YAO, Hajime 1-40-32 Naritahigashi Suginami Tokyo 166-0015 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWABE, Yota 1-87 Nishiki-cho, Tachikawa-shi Tokyo 190-0022 / JP | |||
04 /
KUWABARA, Yutaka 1868-9 Hashie-Machi Isesaki City 372-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
TESHIGAWARA, Junich 395-2 Motogi-Machi Maebashi City 371-0232 / JP | |||
06 /
YANADA, Shugo 304-31 Tsunatori-cho Isesaki City 372-0812 / JP | |||
Former [2014/01] | 01 /
KATO, Shigeo 3-21-1-709 Funabahsi Setagagya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | ||
02 /
YAO, Hajime 1-40-32 Naritahigashi Suginami Tokyo 166-0015 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWABE, Yota 3-13-23-204 Grohongi-Megro-ku Tokyo 153-0053 / JP | |||
04 /
KUWABARA, Yutaka 1868-9 Hashie-Machi Isesaki City 372-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
TESHIGAWARA, Junich 395-2 Motogi-Machi Maebashi City 371-0232 / JP | |||
06 /
YANADA, Shugo 304-31 Tsunatori-cho Isesaki City 372-0812 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 12716776.5 | 24.02.2012 | WO2012US26596 | Priority number, date | US201161446653P | 25.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161446653 P | US201161473296P | 08.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161473296 P | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012116314 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678091 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/00, B01D46/24 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B01D46/2411 (EP,US);
B01D46/00 (KR);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0002 (US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/24 (KR);
B01D46/2414 (EP,US);
B01D46/521 (US);
F01N3/0211 (US);
B01D2265/026 (EP,US);
B01D2265/028 (EP,US);
B01D2271/027 (EP,US);
B01D2275/201 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | "LUFTFILTERPATRONEN; KOMPONENTEN DAVON UND LUFTREINIGERANORDNUNGEN " | [2014/01] | English: | AIR FILTER CARTRIDGES; COMPONENTS THEREOF; AND, AIR CLEANER ASSEMBLIES | [2014/01] | French: | CARTOUCHES DE FILTRE À AIR ET SES COMPOSANTS, ET ENSEMBLES ÉPURATEURS D'AIR | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 05.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1354617 (TOYO ELEMENT KOGYO [JP]) [A] 1* abstract; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2006119414 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-26,30-49 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009014986 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009014982 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 27-29 * page 22, lines 7-15; figures 7a, 23 * * page 27, lines 20-26 * | by applicant | US4452619 | WO2006019414 | WO2009014986 |