EP2700135 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENTS FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT CONTACTOR, MOTOR PROTECTION RELAY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VOLTAGE SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/09] | CIRCUIT ASSEMBLY FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT CONTACTOR, MOTOR PROTECTION RELAY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POWER SUPPLY UNIT | ||
[2017/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Eaton Electrical IP GmbH & Co. KG Airport Center Schönefeld Mittelstrasse 5-5a 12529 Schönefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEID, Wolfgang Amselstr. 16 56218 Mülheim-Kärlich / DE | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Intellectual Power Limited Eaton House 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2014/20] | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2014/09] | Harringer, Thomas, et al Eaton Industries (Austria) GmbH Patent Law Department Scheydgasse 42 1215 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 12717258.3 | 17.04.2012 | [2017/43] | WO2012EP57023 | Priority number, date | EP20110163031 | 19.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11163031 | [2014/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143361 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700135 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2700135 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/06, H02H7/08, H01H47/22 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H02H1/06 (EP,US);
H01H50/44 (US);
H01H51/30 (US);
H02H7/08 (EP,US);
H01H47/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN WECHSELSTROMSCHÜTZ, MOTORSCHUTZRELAIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SPANNUNGSVERSORGUNG | [2014/09] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENTS FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT CONTACTOR, MOTOR PROTECTION RELAY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VOLTAGE SUPPLY | [2017/19] | French: | CIRCUIT ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UN CONTACTEUR À COURANT ALTERNATIF, RELAIS DE PROTECTION DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE ALIMENTATION EN TENSION | [2017/19] |
Former [2014/09] | CIRCUIT ASSEMBLY FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT CONTACTOR, MOTOR PROTECTION RELAY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POWER SUPPLY UNIT | ||
Former [2014/09] | CIRCUITERIE POUR UN CONTACTEUR À COURANT ALTERNATIF, RELAIS DE PROTECTION DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ALIMENTATION EN TENSION | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 27.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2012 | AL | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | AT | 17.04.2018 | IE | 17.04.2018 | LU | 17.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5633774 (ROBERTSON ROGER L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 5; figure 1; claim 11 *; | [AD]EP1050943 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | Examination | EP1111750 | by applicant | EP1050943 |