EP2694433 - HIGH PRESSURE GAS TO LIQUID PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gas Ventures (UK) Limited 3rd Floor 11-12 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4LB / GB | [2018/32] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Gas2 Limited 4 - 5 Union Terrace 4th Floor Aberdeen AB10 1NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANISTER, James c/o Gas2 Limited 4 - 5 Union Terrace, 4th Floor Aberdeen AB10 1NJ / GB | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Wilson, Gary Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 12718727.6 | 30.03.2012 | [2019/04] | WO2012GB50716 | Priority number, date | GB20110005571 | 01.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105571 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012131385 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2694433 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694433 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J12/00, C10G2/00, B01J19/24, C01B3/38 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
C10G2/32 (EP,US);
B01J12/007 (EP,US);
B01J19/2475 (EP,US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,US);
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
C01B3/386 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00078 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2408 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2411 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2423 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2428 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2438 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2453 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2459 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2462 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2475 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2479 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2485 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2487 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/04 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0495 (EP,US);
C01B2203/062 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1035 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C01B2203/127 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | C01B3/36, C10G2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKGAS FÜR FLÜSSIGVERFAHREN | [2014/07] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE GAS TO LIQUID PROCESS | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION DU GAZ EN LIQUIDE À HAUTE PRESSION | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2015 | 31.03.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2016 | 31.03.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 12.10.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2018/16] | 02.07.2018 | Resumption of proceedings | [2018/19] | 12.10.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2018/19] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2012 | AL | 23.01.2019 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | IT | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | IE | 30.03.2019 | LU | 30.03.2019 | MT | 30.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.03.2012 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004002927 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 33 * page 17, lines 19-24 *; | [YD]WO2004098750 (UNIV ROBERT GORDON [GB], et al) [YD] 1-32,34,35 * page 3, lines 4-29 * * page 10, lines 1-13 * * page 20, lines 12-31 * * page 21, lines 30-32 * * page 32, lines 11-23 * * figure 3b * * figure 5 *; | [X]US2007299147 (GIMPEL FREDERIK W H [NL], et al) [X] 33* paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]US2009286890 (JOSHI MAHENDRA LADHARAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-32,34,35 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 57] , [0 61] , [0 65] , [0 67] , [0 68] , [0 70] , [0 76] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0 82] , [0 86] , [0 92] , [ 111] , [ 113] , [ 114] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6344491 | WO2004098750 | GB2403481 | US2005032921 | US2009145589 | - R. GUETTEL; T. TUREK, "Comparison of Different Reactor Types for Low Temperature Fischer-Tropsch Synthesis: A Simulation Study", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 64, pages 955 - 964 |