EP2691514 - CELLULAR SUBSTRATE FOR NUCLEAR REPROGRAMMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Enterprise Limited The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1TN / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Cambridge Enterprise Ltd. The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1TN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRELL, Nicholas Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | 02 /
ORMISTON, Mark Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | 03 /
RANA, Amer Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | 04 /
VALLIER, Ludovic Anne McLaren Laboratory for Regenerative Medicine West Forvie Building Robinson Way Addenbrookes Hospital Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 0SZ / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/06] | 01 /
MORRELL, Nicholas Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | ||
02 /
ORMISTON, Mark Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | |||
03 /
RANA, Amer Department of Medicine Level 5, Addenbrooke's Hospital (Box 157) Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2QQ / GB | |||
04 /
VALLIER, Ludovic Anne McLaren Laboratory for Regenerative Medicine West Forvie Building Robinson Way Addenbrookes Hospital Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 0SZ / GB | Representative(s) | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/06] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12718729.2 | 30.03.2012 | [2017/36] | WO2012GB50718 | Priority number, date | GB20110005413 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: GB 201105413 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012131387 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691514 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691514 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/074 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N2501/602 (EP,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,US);
C12N2501/604 (EP,US);
C12N2501/606 (EP,US);
C12N2506/28 (EP,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | C12N5/078 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLULÄRES SUBSTRAT ZUR KERNREPROGRAMMIERUNG | [2017/16] | English: | CELLULAR SUBSTRATE FOR NUCLEAR REPROGRAMMING | [2014/06] | French: | SUBSTRAT CELLULAIRE POUR LA REPROGRAMMATION NUCLÉAIRE | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/06] | ZELLULARES SUBSTRAT FÜR DIE NUKLEÄRE REPROGRAMMIERUNG | ||
Former [2014/06] | SUBSTRAT CELLULAIRE POUR REPROGRAMMATION NUCLÉAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2012 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | IE | 30.03.2018 | LU | 30.03.2018 | MT | 30.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.03.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.03.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011032166 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [Y] 1-39 * claims 1-31 *; | [X] - PESCE MAURIZIO ET AL, "Endothelial and cardiac progenitors: boosting, conditioning and (re)programming for cardiovascular repair.", PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS JAN 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21035506, (201101), vol. 129, no. 1, ISSN 1879-016X, pages 50 - 61, XP027562598 [X] 1-39 * page 51, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - PEARSON JEREMY D, "Endothelial progenitor cells--an evolving story.", MICROVASCULAR RESEARCH MAY 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20043930, (201005), vol. 79, no. 3, ISSN 1095-9319, pages 162 - 168, XP027014621 [Y] 1-39 * page 163, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - PEARSON J D, "Endothelial progenitor cells - hype or hope?", JOURNAL OF THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, ENGLAND, vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1111/J.1538-7836.2008.03214.X, ISSN 1538-7836, (20090201), pages 255 - 262, (20090127), XP009160305 [Y] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1538-7836.2008.03214.x | [A] - XIE XINXING ET AL, "Another possible cell source for cardiac regenerative medicine: reprogramming adult fibroblasts to cardiomyocytes and endothelial progenitor cells.", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES MAR 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21087827, (201011), vol. 76, no. 3, ISSN 1532-2777, pages 365 - 367, XP028357559 [A] 1-39 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2010.10.041 | by applicant | - TAKAHASHI K ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - TAKAHASHI K. ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - SEKI T. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20091202), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 11 - 4 | - LOH Y.H. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20091202), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 15 - 9 | - STAERK J. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20091202), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 20 - 4 | - HUSSEIN, S.M. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, no. 7336, pages 58 - 62 | - MARTINS-TAYLOR, K. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 29, pages 488 - 91 | - YUSA ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 478, pages 391 - 4 | - FENG B. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2009), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 301 - 12 | - SHORE E.M. ET AL., NAT. GENET., (2006), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 525 - 7 | - OKABE M. ET AL., BLOOD, (20081227), vol. 114, no. 9, pages 1764 - 7 | - EMINLI S. ET AL., NAT GENET., (2009), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 968 - 76 | - GORE, A. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, no. 7336, pages 63 - 7 | - LISTER, R. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, no. 7336, pages 68 - 73 | - PITCHFORD S.C. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20081209), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 62 - 72 | - YODER, M. ET AL., BLOOD, (2007), vol. 109, no. 5, pages 1801 - 9 | - PIAGGIO, G. ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 114, no. 14, pages 3127 - 30 | - HUR ET AL., ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (200402), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 288 - 93 | - LIN, Y. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (2000), vol. 105, no. 1, pages 71 - 7 | - MEDINA ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2010), vol. 51, pages 5906 - 13 | - TOSHNER ET AL., AJRCCM, (2009), vol. 180, no. 8, pages 780 - 7 | - HO WY ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS., (2006), vol. 310, pages 40 - 52 | - Handbook of Stem Cells | - WARREN L ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20101105), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 618 - 30 | - ZHOU H ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (20090508), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 381 - 4 | - VIERBUCHEN T ET AL., NATURE, (20100225), vol. 463, no. 7284, pages 1035 - 41 | - SIDHU KS., EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER., (201105), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 569 - 79 | - WOLTJEN K ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 458, no. 7239, pages 766 - 70 | - CHOU BK ET AL., CELL RES., (2011), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 518 - 29 | - ZHOU H ET AL., CELL STEM CELL., (20090508), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 381 - 4 | - IEDA ET AL., CELL, (2010), vol. 142, pages 375 - 386 | - YAMANAKA ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 448, pages 313 - 7 | - YAMANAKA 6, YAMANAKA 6, (20070607), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 39 - 49 | - KIM ET AL., NATURE, (20080731), vol. 454, no. 7204, pages 646 - 50 | - TAKAHASHI, CELL, (20071130), vol. 131, no. 5, pages 861 - 72 | - PARK ET AL., NATURE, (20080110), vol. 451, no. 7175, pages 141 - 6 | - KIMET, CELL STEM CELL, (20090605), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 472 - 6 | - VALLIER, L. ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2009), vol. 27, pages 2655 - 66 | - YU ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 318, pages 1917 - 1920 | - TESAR, P. J. ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 448, pages 196 - 199 | - NICHOLS, J.; SMITH, A., CELL STEM CELL, (2009), vol. 4, pages 487 - 492 | - YING, Q. L. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 453, pages 519 - 523 | - HANNA J ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20100518), vol. 107, no. 20, pages 9222 - 7 | - HAN DW ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL., (201101), vol. 13, no. L, pages 66 - 71 | - SILVA J ET AL., CELL, (20090821), vol. 138, no. 4, pages 722 - 37 | - PLEWS JR ET AL., PLOS ONE, (20101230), vol. 5, no. 12, page E14397 | - VALLIER, L. ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (2004), vol. 275, pages 403 - 421 | - COWAN, C.A. ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2004), vol. 350, pages 1353 - 1356 | - JOANNIDES, A. ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2006), vol. 24, pages 230 - 235 | - KLIMANSKAYA, I. ET AL., LANCET, (2005), vol. 365, pages 1636 - 1641 | - LUDWIG,T.E. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 24, pages 185 - 187 | - LUDWIG ET AL., NAT BIOTECH, (2006), vol. 24, page 185 | - JOHANSSON; WILES, MOL CELL BIOL, (1995), vol. 15, pages 141 - 151 | - BARBARIC I ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS., (201008), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 1046 - 50 | - CONSORTIUM ET AL., NAT GENET, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 81 - 4 | - LAURENT, L.C. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2011), vol. 7, pages 106 - 18 | - LIANG, Q ET AL., PNAS U S A, (2008), vol. 11, pages 17453 - 6 | - DE CID, NAT. GENET., (2009), vol. 41, pages 211 - 5 |