EP2883195 - ONE-TOUCH SUPPORT SERVICES APPLICATION PROGRAMMING INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teletech Holdings Inc. 9197 South Peoria Street Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCHMAN, Kenneth D. 9197 South Peoria Street, 2-336 Englewood Colorado 80112 / US | 02 /
SHARPE, Bruce A. 2783 South Danube Street Aurora Colorado 80013 / US | 03 /
TRUONG, Henry D. 4 Meadowcrest Lane Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824-3777 / US | 04 /
RAHN, Alan B. 8905 Copeland Street Highlands Ranch Colorado 80126 / US | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12718795.3 | 12.04.2012 | WO2012US33400 | Priority number, date | US201113085398 | 12.04.2011 Original published format: US201113085398 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012142341 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2883195 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP,GB,US);
G06Q30/016 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMMIERUNGSSCHNITTSTELLEN FÜR ONE-TOUCH-SUPPORTDIENSTE | [2015/25] | English: | ONE-TOUCH SUPPORT SERVICES APPLICATION PROGRAMMING INTERFACES | [2015/25] | French: | INTERFACES DE PROGRAMMATION D'APPLICATION DE SERVICES DE SUPPORT À TOUCHE UNIQUE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008083345 (PEAK8 PARTNERS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0189] *[I] 2-8,10-16 | International search | [A]US6138139 (BECK CHRISTOPHER CLEMMETT MACL [US], et al)[A] 1-21; | [Y]US2006011716 (PERKOWSKI THOMAS J [US]) [Y] 1-21; | [Y]US2010145730 (ABREU MARCIO MARC [US]) [Y] 1-21 |