EP2700237 - POSITION INDICATOR FOR 3D DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRULS, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Alfonsus c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12720618.3 | 13.04.2012 | WO2012IB51832 | Priority number, date | EP20110163133 | 20.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11163133 | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143836 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700237 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/02, H04N13/04 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H04N13/349 (EP,RU,US);
H04N13/327 (EP,RU,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | POSITIONSANZEIGE FÜR EIN 3D-DISPLAY | [2014/09] | English: | POSITION INDICATOR FOR 3D DISPLAY | [2014/09] | French: | INDICATEUR DE POSITION POUR AFFICHAGE 3D | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2888000 (LEVECQ XAVIER JEAN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-11,13-15 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, lines 4-9 * * page 4; figures 1,2,3 * * page 6, lines 1-9 * * page 8, lines 16-33 * * page 9, lines 12-19 * * page 10, lines 19-33 * [I] 3,5,6,8,12; | [A]WO2011013030 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 12 * page 1, lines 21-23 * * page 4, lines 8-14 * * page 12, lines 16-19 * * page 13, lines 6-27 * * page 18, lines 8-14 ** page 19, lines 16-19 * | Examination | FR2888000 | WO2011013030 | by applicant | WO9723097 | US6055013 |