EP2699225 - COMBINATION OF CAROTENOID, PHYTOOESTROGEN AND VITAMIN C FOR MOISTURIZING THE SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUTRICOS Technologies 41 rue Martre 92117 Clichy Cedex / FR | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Laboratoires Inneov SNC 3 avenue Sainte Anne 92602 Asnieres / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICCARDI, Nathalie 33 Grande Rue F-21310 Arceau / FR | 02 /
BRU, Carole 5 rue Olivier Noyer F-75014 Paris / FR | [2019/34] |
Former [2014/09] | 01 /
PICCARDI, Nathalie 33 Grande Rue F-21310 Arceau / FR | ||
02 /
BRU, Carole 5 rue Olivier Noyer F-7501 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/09] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12720635.7 | 17.04.2012 | [2019/51] | WO2012IB51925 | Priority number, date | FR20110053396 | 19.04.2011 Original published format: FR 1153396 | US201161499198P | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161499198 P | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143857 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699225 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699225 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/67, A61Q19/00, A61K8/49, A61K8/31 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61K2800/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON EINER KOMBINATION EINES KAROTENOID, EINES PHYTOÖSTROGEN UND VITAMIN C ALS WIRKSTOFF ZUR FEUCHTIGKEITSVERSORGUNG DER HAUT. | [2019/33] | English: | COMBINATION OF CAROTENOID, PHYTOOESTROGEN AND VITAMIN C FOR MOISTURIZING THE SKIN | [2014/09] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA COMBINAISON D'UN CAROTÉNOÏDE, D'UN HYTOESTROGÉNE ET DE VITAMINE C COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF POUR L'HYDRATATION DE LA PEAU | [2019/34] |
Former [2014/09] | KOMBINATION AUS KAROTENOID, PHYTOÖSTROGEN UND VITAMIN C ZUR FEUCHTIGKEITSVERSORGUNG DER HAUT | ||
Former [2014/09] | COMBINAISON DE CAROTÉNOÏDES, DE PHYTOESTROGÈNES ET DE VITAMINE C DESTINÉE À HYDRATER LA PEAU | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2019 | 08.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2012 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | GB | 17.04.2020 | IE | 17.04.2020 | LU | 17.04.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
GB | 17.04.2020 | ||
IE | 17.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
GB | 17.04.2020 | ||
IE | 17.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
GB | 17.04.2020 | ||
IE | 17.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IE | 17.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202004013660U (ORTHOMOL PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERTR [DE]) [A] 1-19 * page 4, paragraph 34 - page 4, paragraph 36 * * example - *; | [Y]FR2885491 (INNEOV LAB [FR]) [Y] 1-19 * page 4, line 22 - line 28 * * page 11, line 7 - line 26 *; | [XY]WO2009050101 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,13-19 * page 2, line 25 - line 35 * * page 3, line 6 - line 21 * * page 6, line 1 - line 6 * * page 11, line 1 - line 19 * * example 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-19; | [Y]FR2939040 (INNEOV SNC LAB [FR]) [Y] 1-19 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, lines 5-7,21-25 * * page 11, lines 21-24 * * page 13, lines 9-12 * * page 17, line 19 - page 18, line 9 * * example 1 *; | [A] - CHOI ET AL, "Cosmeceuticals", SEMINARS IN CUTANEOUS MEDICINE AND SURGERY, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20060901), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.SDER.2006.06.010, ISSN 1085-5629, pages 163 - 168, XP005703032 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sder.2006.06.010 | by applicant | WO9510530 | WO9510512 | DE4432947 | US5554519 | JPH08283136 | WO9726269 | US5679806 | EP0812837 | WO9747278 | JP2940964B | WO0191588 | WO0234232 | WO0234233 | - EFSA JOURNAL, (2009), vol. 7, no. 9, page 1226 | - "Isoflavonoids", P.M. DEWICK, The Flavonoids, HARBONE, (1988), pages 125 - 157 |