EP2709786 - METHOD FOR THE COHESIVE CONNECTION OF ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Stefan Marienstr. 27 63549 Ronneburg / DE | 02 /
VON CAMPE, Hilmar Jakob-Lengfelder-Str. 19 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
HUBER, Stephan Nasenbachstr. 6 83562 Rechtmehring / DE | 04 /
BÖHME, Sven Am Mühlweg 1 09600 Niederschöna / DE | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2014/13] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 12720889.0 | 15.05.2012 | [2017/13] | WO2012EP59039 | Priority number, date | DE20111050436 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011050436 | DE20111051024 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011051024 | [2014/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156412 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709786 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2709786 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/06 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
B23K1/0012 (EP,CN,US);
H01L24/80 (US);
B23K1/06 (EP,CN,US);
B23K20/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFARHEN ZUM STOFFSCHLÜSSIGEN VERBINDEN VON ELEMENTEN | [2014/13] | English: | METHOD FOR THE COHESIVE CONNECTION OF ELEMENTS | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RELIER DES ÉLÉMENTS PAR LIAISON DE MATIÈRE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 21.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2012 | AL | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | MT | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | AT | 15.05.2017 | IE | 15.05.2017 | LU | 15.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | GB | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE2236699 (SIEMENS AG) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102006035626 (ZENTRUM FUER MATERIAL UND UMWE [DE]) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [AD]EP2289658 (MTA AUTOMATION AG [CH]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2236699 | DE4104160 | US6357649 | US2005217718 | WO2008014900 | DE102006035626 | EP2289658 | - MARDESICH ET AL., "A Low-Cost Photovoltaic Cell Process Based on Thick Film Techniques", 14TH IEEE PV, SP.CONF. PROC., (1980), pages 943 - 947 |