EP2686221 - VEHICLE HAVING A TEXTILE CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2016/17] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFLER, Werner Chenhui Road No. 828 Room 301 Block 43, 18502118414 201203 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
ROHWERDER, Dirk Dorfstr. 2 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 12721259.5 | 10.05.2012 | [2016/17] | WO2012EP58631 | Priority number, date | DE20111075981 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011075981 | [2014/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156272 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686221 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686221 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/18, B60R13/02 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP,US);
B60R13/0212 (EP,US);
B61D17/18 (EP,US);
B61D27/0018 (US);
B61D27/0072 (EP,US);
B60R2013/0287 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT TEXTILKANAL | [2014/04] | English: | VEHICLE HAVING A TEXTILE CHANNEL | [2014/04] | French: | VÉHICULE À CONDUIT TEXTILE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 11.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2012 | AL | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | MT | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | IE | 10.05.2016 | LU | 10.05.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NO | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4430075 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE10140985 (TRUMA GERAETETECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005040571 (SPHEROS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0029] , [ 0031]; figures 3, 4a * |