EP2850799 - CALL TERMINATION TO A ICS USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUESSEM, Volker Waldstrasse 39 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 02 /
RANKE, Karl-Peter Haus-Heyden-Strasse 107a 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 03 /
MAYNTZ, Claudia An der Kant 18e 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | von Zmuda-Trzebiatowski, Margarethe, et al Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 12721302.3 | 16.05.2012 | WO2012EP59149 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170893 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2850799 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04W76/36 (US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1073 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | ANRUFZUSTELLUNG AN EINEN ICS-BENUTZER | [2015/13] | English: | CALL TERMINATION TO A ICS USER | [2015/13] | French: | FIN DE COMMUNICATION AVEC UN UTILISATEUR D'ICS | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008267199 (SMITH IAN [IE], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0078] *; | [A] - "(GSM) European digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2); Restoration procedures (GSM 03.07); ETS 300 525", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (19940901), vol. SMG3, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014013568 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 4.2.1 - page 10 * | Examination | US2003027572 |