EP2702409 - CXCR1 as a predictor of response to treatment with epidermal growth factor receptor targeted therapeutic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/10] | CXCR1 AS A PREDICTOR OF RESPONSE TO TREATMENT WITH EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR THERAPEUTIC | ||
[2015/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 5NN / GB | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAUGH, David John James 50 Ballycrochan Avenue Bangor Down BT19 7LA / GB | 02 /
WILSON, Richard 23 Cranmore Gardens Belfast, Antrim BT9 6JL / GB | 03 /
OLADIPO, Olabode 5A Croft Hill Cottages Belfast, Antrim BT8 6BA / GB | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
WAUGH, David John James 50 Ballycrochan Avenue Bangor Down BT19 7LA / GB | ||
02 /
WILSON, Richard 23 Cranmore Gardens Belfast, AntrimBT9 6JL / GB | |||
03 /
OLADIPO, Olabode 5A Croft Hill Cottages Belfast, Antrim BT8 6BA / GB | Representative(s) | Thom, Russell Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2014/10] | Application number, filing date | 12721333.8 | 25.04.2012 | [2015/37] | WO2012GB50906 | Priority number, date | GB20110006870 | 26.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201106870 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012146919 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2702409 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2702409 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, C12Q1/68 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/726 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CXCR1 zur Vorhersage der Reaktion auf die Behandlung mit einem Mittel gegen epidermalen Wachstumsfaktor-Rezeptor | [2015/11] | English: | CXCR1 as a predictor of response to treatment with epidermal growth factor receptor targeted therapeutic | [2015/11] | French: | Utilisation de CXCR1 pour prévoir la réponse à un traitement avec agent thérapeutique ciblant le récepteur du facteur de croissance épidermique | [2015/11] |
Former [2014/10] | CXCR1 ALS PRÄDIKTOR DER REAKTION AUF DIE BEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM EPIDERMALEN WACHSTUMSFAKTORREZEPTOR | ||
Former [2014/10] | CXCR1 AS A PREDICTOR OF RESPONSE TO TREATMENT WITH EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR THERAPEUTIC | ||
Former [2014/10] | UTILISATION DE CXCR1 POUR PRÉVOIR LA RÉPONSE À UN TRAITEMENT AVEC LE RÉCEPTEUR DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ÉPIDERMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 10.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2012 | AL | 09.09.2015 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | LU | 25.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007128636 (BAKER JOFFRE B [US], et al); | [YA]US2009258364 (GOEL SANJAY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010145796 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [XY]US2011053787 (BRULLIARD MARIE [FR], et al) | by applicant | WO9116051 | US5196446 | US5558864 | WO9630347 | WO9633980 | US5616582 | US5646153 | WO9727199 | US5656655 | WO9730034 | US5679683 | WO9742187 | WO9749688 | WO9833798 | US5891996 | WO0018761 | WO0031048 | US6235883 |