EP2686274 - THERMAL INSULATION MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinvent AS 7465 Trondheim / NO | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JELLE, Bjørn Petter Ada Arnfinsens veg 12 N-7036 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
TILSET, Bente Gilbu Klokkejordet 33 N -1395 Hvalstad / NO | 03 /
JAHREN, Susie Skovveien 2b N-0259 Oslo / NO | 04 /
GUSTAVSEN, Arild Henrik Angells gate 24 N-7045 Trondheim / NO | 05 /
GAO, Tao Kroppanmarka 48 N-7075 Trondheim / NO | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Hermansen, Cécile Irene Bryn Aarflot AS Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Hermansen, Cécile Irene Bryn Aarflot AS P.O. Box 449 Sentrum 0104 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 12721618.2 | 19.03.2012 | WO2012NO50045 | Priority number, date | US201161454031P | 18.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161454031 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012128642 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686274 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/193, C01B33/187, E04B1/74 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C01B33/187 (EP,US);
B28B11/00 (US);
C01B33/193 (EP,US);
E04B1/76 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/34 (EP,US);
E04B2001/742 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Title | German: | WÄRMEISOLATIONSMATERIAL | [2014/04] | English: | THERMAL INSULATION MATERIALS | [2014/04] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CN101585954 [ ]; | [X]US6004525 (TANI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 35 - column 6, line 46 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]US6221326 (AMICHE FREDERIC [FR]) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 51 - column 6, line 48 *; | [XI]US2005244322 (CHEN JIANFENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-10,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] - [0022] - [0035] - [0068] * [I] 11-20; | [X]US2007036736 (KALLA KAREN K [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0009] - [0016] - [0030] - [0038] * * figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP1886972 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-10,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] - [0077] * [A] 6,16 [I] 11-15,17-20; | [XDA]CN101585954 (INST PROCESS ENG CAS [CN]) [XD] 1-5,8,9,11-15,18,19 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,10,16,17,20,21; | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 02, Database accession no. 2009-S00437, & CN101585954 A 20091125 (CHINESE ACAD SCI INST PROCESS ENG) [ ] * abstract * | [XA] - LEE C W ET AL, "Microstructural evolution of iron oxide hollow nanoparticles toward iron oxide nanotubes in a prolonged sintering condition", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 63, no. 30, doi:10.1016/J.MATLET.2009.09.010, ISSN 0167-577X, (20091231), pages 2607 - 2610, (20090912), XP026699563 [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 6,11-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matlet.2009.09.010 | by applicant | CN101585954 | - R. BAETENS; B. P. JELLE; J. V. THUE; M. J. TENPIERIK; S. GRYNNING; S. UVSLOKK; A. GUSTAVSEN, "Vacuum insulation panels for building applications: A review and beyond", ENERGY AND BUILDINGS, (2010), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enbuild.2009.09.005, pages 147 - 172, XP026785700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enbuild.2009.09.005 | - R. BAETENS; B. P. JELLE; A. GUSTAVSEN, "Aerogel insulation for building applications: A state-of-the-art review", ENERGY AND BUILDINGS, (2011), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enbuild.2010.12.012, pages 761 - 769, XP028359509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enbuild.2010.12.012 | - B. P. JELLE; A. GUSTAVSEN; R. BAETENS, "The path to the high performance thermal building insulation materials and solutions of tomorrow", JOUMAL OF BUILDING PHYSICS, (2010), vol. 34, pages 99 - 123 | - U. HEINEMANN, "Influence of water on the total heat transfer in 'evacuated' insulations", INTERNATIONAL JOUMAL OF THERMOPHYSICS, (2008), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1007/s10765-007-0361-1, pages 735 - 749, XP055019351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10765-007-0361-1 | - J.-P. MULET; K. JOULAIN; R. CARMINATI; J.-J. GREFFET, "Enhanced radiative heat transfer at nanometric distances", MICROSCALE THERMOPHYSICAL ENGINEERING, (2002), vol. 6, pages 209 - 222 | - K. JOULAIN; J.-P. MULET; F. MARQUIER; R. CARMINATI; J.-J. GREFFET, "Surface electromagnetic waves thermally excited: Radiative heat transfer, coherence properties and Casimir forces revisited in the near field", SURFACE SCIENCE REPORTS, (2005), vol. 57, doi:doi:10.1016/j.surfrep.2004.12.002, pages 59 - 112, XP025257020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfrep.2004.12.002 | - G. S. GRADER; Y. DE HAZAN; G. E. SHTER, "Ultra light ceramic foams", SOL-GEL SYNTHESIS AND PROCESSING, (1998), vol. 95, pages 161 - 172 | - Y. DU; L. E. LUNA; W. S. TAN; M. F. RUBNER; R. E. COHEN, "Hollow silica nanoparticles in UV-visible antireflection coatings for poly(methyl methacrylate) substrates", ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/nn101033y, pages 4308 - 4316, XP055283208 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn101033y | - Y. WAN; S.-H. YU, "Polyelectrolyte controlled large-scale synthesis of hollow silica spheres with tunable sizes and wall thicknesses", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (2008), vol. 112, pages 3641 - 3647 |