EP2708096 - DIMMABLE LED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHANEM, Mohamed, Cherif 1940 Onesime-gagon Lachine, QC H8T 3M6 / CA | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Picker, Madeline Margaret GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12722047.3 | 11.05.2012 | WO2012US37468 | Priority number, date | US201161485829P | 13.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161485829 P | US201213436040 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US201213436040 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012158498 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2708096 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/59 (EP);
H05B45/375 (EP,US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | DIMMBARE LED-LAMPE | [2014/12] | English: | DIMMABLE LED LAMP | [2014/12] | French: | LAMPE À DEL DIMMABLE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/27] | 27.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/27] | Appeal following examination | 28.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T1715/19 | 17.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010213859 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 114; figure 114 ref.115D * * together with fig.14;; figure 21 * * page 121; figure 15 ref.115E * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0142]; figure 19 * [Y] 18,19; | [A]EP2224789 (OSRAM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2011008635 (IWATT INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,12 * figure 5 * * LED lamp; paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * power converter; paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * chopping circuit; paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041]; figure 6 * * phase detection; paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0062] * [I] 3-5,7,8,11,13-17; | [X]US2011025217 (ZHAN XIAODONG [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figure 5 *; | [Y] - MARVELL SEMICONDUCTOR, "Marvell Response (LED DRiver PFC Section)", REPORT, (20100621), pages 1 - 11, XP002699674 [Y] 18,19 * points 12 and 13; page 9 * | [A] - OSRAM SYLVANIA, "High quality down lighting luminaire", SPECIFICATION, (20080630), pages 1 - 12, XP002699675 [A] 18,19 * page 2 * * page 7; table 2 * | Examination | EP2651188 |