EP2708048 - METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR DETECTING GESTURE-BASED COMMANDS FOR A GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSION ON A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/12] | METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIA FOR DETECTING GESTURE-BASED COMMANDS FOR A GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSION ON A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | ||
[2017/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHODAPKAR, Chinmay S. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/12] | 01 /
DHODAPKAR, Chinmay S. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12723564.6 | 11.05.2012 | WO2012US37574 | Priority number, date | US201113106269 | 12.05.2011 Original published format: US201113106269 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012155069 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2708048 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/18, H04W4/20 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/08 (KR);
H04L12/1827 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/4046 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/12] | H04W4/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR ERKENNUNG GESTENBASIERTER BEFEHLE FÜR EINE GRUPPENKOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNG IN EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR DETECTING GESTURE-BASED COMMANDS FOR A GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSION ON A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2017/40] | French: | MÈTHODES; APPAREILS ET LOGICIEL POUR APERCEVOIR DES INSTRUCTIONS BASÉES SUR DES GESTES POUR UNE SESSION DE COMMUNICATION DE GROUPE SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2017/40] |
Former [2014/12] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERLESBARE SPEICHERMEDIEN ZUR ERKENNUNG GESTENBASIERTER BEFEHLE FÜR EINE GRUPPENKOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNG AUF EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/12] | METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIA FOR DETECTING GESTURE-BASED COMMANDS FOR A GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSION ON A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | ||
Former [2014/12] | INSTRUCTIONS BASÉES SUR DES GESTES POUR UNE SESSION DE COMMUNICATION DE GROUPE SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP14171214.1 / EP2782371 | EP18190855.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005124365 (BALASURIYA SENAKA [US], et al) [X] 21-34,37,40,43 * paragraphs [0002] - [0027]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2009009588 (SHAFFER SHMUEL [US], et al) [A] 21-34,37,40,43* paragraphs [0002] - [0028]; figures 1,3 *; | [I]US2009054107 (FELAND III JOHN MORGAN [US], et al) [I] 1-20,35,36,38,39,41,42 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - [0039]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US2009076827 (BULITTA CLEMENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20,35,36,38,39,41,42 * paragraphs [0042] - [0043] - [0058] - [0076]; figure 9 *; | [I]US2009215410 (CAI ZHENG [US], et al) [I] 21-34,37,40,43 * paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2010251177 (GEPPERT BIRGIT [US], et al) [A] 1-20,35,36,38,39,41,42 * paragraphs [0004] - [0048] - [0065] *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP enablers for Open Mobile Alliance (OMA); Push-to-talk over Cellular (PoC) services; Stage 2 (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.979, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110329), no. V10.0.0, pages 1 - 38, XP050476497 [A] 1-20,35,36,38,39,41,42 * paragraphs [0005] - [5.3.2.2]; figure 5.3.1 * |