EP2707117 - LIQUID FILTRATION MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Hyun Sung 2800 Aylesford Drive Midlothian Virginia 23113 / US | 02 /
MARIN, Robert Anthony 519 Ridgemoor Place Midlothian Virginia 23114 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Patrick Henry 10610 Spring Run Road Chesterfield Virginia 23832 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Guanghui 5144 Hart Mill Drive Glen Allen Virginia 23060 / US | 05 /
COMPTON, Timothy Frederick 5307 Beaver Spring Road Midlothian Virginia 23112 / US | 06 /
FRISK, Simon 710 Colgate Lane Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [2014/18] |
Former [2014/12] | 01 /
LIM, Hyun Sung 2800 Aylesford Drive Midlothian Virginia 23113 / US | ||
02 /
MARIN, Robert Anthony 519 Ridgemoor Place Midlothian Virginia 23114 / US | |||
03 /
YOUNG, Patrick Henry 1306 Woodhugh Place Colonial Heights Virginia 23834 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Guanghui 5144 Hart Mill Drive Glen Allen Virginia 23060 / US | |||
05 /
COMPTON, Timothy Frederick 5307 Beaver Spring Road Midlothian Virginia 23112 / US | |||
06 /
FRISK, Simon 710 Colgate Lane Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Representative(s) | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12723784.0 | 14.05.2012 | WO2012US37847 | Priority number, date | US201161485830P | 13.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161485830 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012158647 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2707117 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, D04H3/16 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (KR);
B01D29/11 (US);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTRIERMEDIEN | [2014/12] | English: | LIQUID FILTRATION MEDIA | [2014/12] | French: | SUPPORTS DE FILTRATION PAR VOIE LIQUIDE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4652322 (LIM HYUN S [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * example - * [I] 7-14; | [A]WO0161082 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-6,15 * the whole document *; | [ID]US7744989 (MARIN ROBERT ANTHONY [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7744989 | US6114017 |