EP2709493 - SEAT BUCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/13] | SEAT SHELL FOR SEATING FURNITURE | ||
[2016/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASS Einrichtungssysteme GmbH ASS-Adam-Stegner-Strasse 19 96342 Stockheim / DE | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Stefan Gossenberger Str. 5 96253 Untersiemau / DE | 02 /
WELSCH, Johannes Kunigundenruhstr. 13 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | 2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | 2s | ip Schramm Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/13] | Bettinger Schneider Schramm Postfach 860267 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12723853.3 | 21.05.2012 | [2017/09] | WO2012EP59337 | Priority number, date | DE20111076196 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011076196 | [2014/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012160013 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709493 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2709493 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/02, A47C7/74 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A47C3/12 (EP,US);
A47C5/12 (US);
A47C7/16 (US);
A47C7/746 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZSCHALE FÜR SITZMÖBEL | [2014/13] | English: | SEAT BUCKET | [2016/37] | French: | BOL POUR UN SIÈGE | [2016/37] |
Former [2014/13] | SEAT SHELL FOR SEATING FURNITURE | ||
Former [2014/13] | ASSISE POUR SIÈGE | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2012 | AL | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | MT | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | IE | 21.05.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 01.03.2017 | |
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US904469 (ANDERSON FORTESQUE WELLINGTON [US]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [XYI]NL7210430 (STOREY BROTHERS AND COMPANY LIMITED) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 8,9,11-13; | [XYI]US4040881 (WALLACE EARL C) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 8,9,11-13; | [XYI]US4084775 (PELLY CHARLES W) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 8,9,11-13; | [Y]DE10121472 (IGLSEDER HEINRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 10* the whole document *; | [Y]US7114776 (WILTBERGER CHARLES M [US]) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010085707 (WILLINGHAM WILLIAM PRESTON [US]) [Y] 5 * the whole document * |