EP2715300 - SENSOR FOR MEASURING PRESSURE AND/OR FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piezocryst Advanced Sensorics GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRICKER, Alexander Anton-Schwarz-Gasse 17 A-8046 Graz / AT | 02 /
MAYER, Andreas Eythgasse 33 A-8052 Graz / AT | 03 /
KRÖGER, Dietmar Lehargasse 8 A-8010 Graz / AT | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/15] | Pinter, Rudolf, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12723876.4 | 31.05.2012 | [2016/32] | WO2012EP60242 | Priority number, date | AT20110000828 | 03.06.2011 Original published format: AT 8282011 | [2014/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012164016 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2715300 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715300 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00, G01L15/00, G01L1/16, G01L9/06, G01L9/08, G01L1/18 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G01L9/008 (EP,US);
G01L1/16 (US);
G01L1/162 (EP,US);
G01L15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR FÜR DIE MESSUNG VON DRUCK UND/ODER KRAFT | [2014/15] | English: | SENSOR FOR MEASURING PRESSURE AND/OR FORCE | [2014/15] | French: | CAPTEUR DE MESURE DE PRESSION ET/OU DE FORCE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Kistler Instrumente AG Eulachstrasse 22 8408 Winterthur / CH | [2017/24] | 20.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.10.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2012 | AL | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | MT | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | AT | 31.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | GB | 31.05.2017 | IE | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | LU | 31.05.2017 | DE | 01.12.2017 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/26] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
GB | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/20] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2006137456 (DASGUPTA SAMHITA [US], et al) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]WO2007128149 (KISTLER HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US4995014 | JP2004226295 | by applicant | JP2004226294 | US2006137456 | Opposition | AT353506B | EP0065511 | WO9013010 | WO2007128149 | AT503558 | WO2012083472 | - Tichy, Jan und Gustav Gautschi, Piezoelektrische Messtechnik. Physikalische Grundlagen, Kraft-, Druck- und Beschleunigungsaufnehmer, Verstärker, Springer Verlag, (19800000), pages 2pp, vi-xiii, 5-7, 185 - 190, ISBN 9783540094487, XP055385732 | - P. MOULIN et al., "3.2.5 Benefits of a Cylinder Pressure Based Engine Management System on a Vehicle", P. MOULIN et al., Sven Krueger, Wolfgang Gessner, Advanced microsystems for automotive applications yearbook 2002, Berlin , Heidelberg , New York, Springer - Verlag, (20020000), pages 2pp, vi, xiv-xvi, 197 - 205, ISBN 978-3-540-43232-6, XP055385743 |