EP2712335 - LASER MATERIAL PROCESSING SYSTEM WITH AT LEAST ONE INERTIAL SENSOR; CORRESPONDING LASER PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precitec GmbH & CO. KG Draisstrasse 1 76571 Gaggenau-Bad Rotenfels / DE | For all designated states Precitec ITM GmbH & CO. KG Schleussnerstraße 54 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORK GENANNT WERSBORG, Ingo Amalienstrasse 89 80799 München / DE | 02 /
BORN, Frederik Berlepschstrasse 12 81373 München / DE | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2015/38] |
Former [2014/14] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12724078.6 | 14.05.2012 | [2015/38] | WO2012EP02062 | Priority number, date | EP20110003992 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11003992 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156071 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712335 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712335 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/08, B23K26/20, B23K26/38, B23K26/04, B23K26/06 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B23K26/046 (EP,US);
B23K26/08 (US);
B23K26/032 (US);
B23K26/042 (EP,US);
B23K26/0648 (EP,US);
B23K26/083 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | "LASERMATERIALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT MINDESTENS EINEM TRÄGHEITSSENSOR; ENTSPRECHENDES LASERVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN" | [2014/14] | English: | LASER MATERIAL PROCESSING SYSTEM WITH AT LEAST ONE INERTIAL SENSOR; CORRESPONDING LASER PROCESSING METHOD | [2014/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAU AU LASER À L'AIDE D'AU MOINS UN CAPTEUR INERTIEL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT AU LASER CORRESPONDANT | [2014/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | GB | 14.05.2016 | IE | 14.05.2016 | LU | 14.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 14.05.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.05.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.05.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.05.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.05.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.05.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.05.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.05.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.05.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4960970 (SCHNEITER JOHN L [US]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 7; example - *; | [Y]JPH09122948 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]US6188078 (BELL JR RAYMOND MACK [US], et al) [Y] 2,14 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 24; figure - *; | [X]JP2008000801 (TOKYU CAR CORP) [X] 1,3,4,10-12,16* abstract *; | [XYI]DE102007035485 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,16 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2,7,10,14 [I] 5,8,13,15 | Examination | DE102007035485 | by applicant | DE10061644 | - HORN; SCHUNCK, "Determining optical flow", ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCES, (1981), vol. 17, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/0004-3702(81)90024-2, pages 185 - 203, XP000195787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0004-3702(81)90024-2 |