EP2705382 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SYNTHETIC APERTURE SONAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hadal, Inc. 1907 Dennison Street Oakland, CA 94606 / US | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIKOSKI, Richard, J. 1500 Ferry Pt Bldg 167, Ste 200 Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2017/15] |
Former [2014/11] | 01 /
RIKOSKI, Richard, J. 1500 Ferry Pt Bldg 167, Ste 200 Alameda CA 94501 / US | Representative(s) | Rashid, Jeremy Suhail, et al White & Case LLP 5 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1 DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12725180.9 | 07.05.2012 | [2017/15] | WO2012US36828 | Priority number, date | US201161483549P | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483549 P | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012154694 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705382 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705382 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01S15/89, G01C21/00, G05D1/06 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G01C21/005 (EP,US);
G01V1/38 (US);
G01C21/203 (EP,US);
G01S15/89 (EP,US);
G01S15/8904 (US);
G01S7/52003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN SONAR MIT SYNTHETISCHER APERTUR | [2014/11] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SYNTHETIC APERTURE SONAR | [2014/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN SONAR À SYNTHÈSE D'OUVERTURE | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17166109.3 / EP3211446 | EP17166110.1 / EP3211447 | EP17166111.9 / EP3211448 | EP17166113.5 / EP3211449 | EP17166114.3 / EP3211450 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2012 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 07.05.2017 | LU | 07.05.2017 | MT | 07.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4924229 (EICHEL PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - column 12, line 42 *; | [A]US5155706 (HALEY PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5793703 (SHIPPEY GEOFFREY ARTHUR [SE]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - column 3, line 18 * * column 7, line 11 - column 10, line 25 * * column 13, lines 1-21 *; | [YD] - RIKOSKI R ET AL, "Holographic navigation", 2008 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. THE HALF-DAY WORKSHOP ON: TOWARDS AUTONOMOUS AGRICULTURE OF TOMORROW, IEEE - PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080519), ISBN 978-1-4244-1646-2, pages 73 - 80, XP031340133 [YD] 1-20 * the whole document * | [Y] - DOUGLAS B L ET AL, "Synthetic aperture active sonar imaging", SPEECH PROCESSING 1. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 23 - 26, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920323), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1992.226282, ISBN 978-0-7803-0532-8, pages 37 - 40, XP010058946 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1992.226282 | [A] - JOHN FOLKESSON, JACQUES LEEDERKERKEN, ROB WILLIAMS, ANDREW PATRIKALAKIS, AND JOHN LEONARD, "A Feature Based Navigation System for anAutonomous Underwater Robot", 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FIELD AND SERVICE ROBOTICS, Chamonix, (20071207), pages 1 - 10, XP002680906 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - GRIFFITHS H D, "A comparison between radar and sonar synthetic aperture interferometry", 19970411, (19970411), pages 4/1 - 4/5, XP006509424 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5295188 | US8159387 | - Digital Signal Processing Applications with the TMS320 Family, TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, (1990), vol. I, II, I | - The C++ Programming Language, STROUSTRUP ADDISION-WESLEY | US20090454486 | US20090454484 | US20090454885 | US20100798169 | US20100802453 | US20100802455 | US20100802454 |