EP2763560 - SANDAL, SET OF A SANDAL AND STRIPS AND METHOD FOR FORMING A SANDAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliplocker B.V. Rooseveltlaan 50-II 1078 NK Amsterdam / NL | [2015/14] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Fliplocker B.V. Karel Doormanlaan 1 2111 XC Aerdenhout / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEHMEIJER, Stephan Bernard Willem Karel Doormanlaan 1 NL-2111 XC Aerdenhout / NL | 02 /
VAN DER VECHT, Arnaud Carel Hendrik Zandvoortselaan 188 NL-2106 AP Heemstede / NL | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 12725538.8 | 23.05.2012 | WO2012NL50358 | Priority number, date | NL20112006833 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: NL 2006833 | US201161488862P | 23.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161488862 P | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012161576 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763560 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/10, A43B3/24 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A43B3/103 (EP);
A43B3/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | SANDALE, SANDALENPAAR UND BÄNDER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SANDALE | [2014/33] | English: | SANDAL, SET OF A SANDAL AND STRIPS AND METHOD FOR FORMING A SANDAL | [2014/33] | French: | SANDALE, ENSEMBLE SANDALE ET LANIÈRES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE SANDALE | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 08.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/30] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1123783 (PLEE, RAYMONDE) [X] 1,5-10,12,13,15 * figure - *; | [X]WO0184973 (GIANNELLI ROBERTO [IT]) [X] 1,5-10,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007245597 (KRUTILEK PAMELA K [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007]; figure - * [I] 11; | [X]US2009044423 (AMSTERDAM JOHN [US]) [X] 1,5-10,12,13,15 * figure - *; | [XI]US2010212184 (RUDD JR WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figure - * [I] 11; | [X]US2011099840 (AVENI MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1,5-10,12,13,15 * figure - *; | [XP]WO2011134032 (SAO PAULO ALPARGATAS [BR], et al) [XP] 1-4,7-10,12-14* figure - * | by applicant | EP0867130 | AU20120053404 |