EP2717820 - ABSORBENT STRUCTURE FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2022/36] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSATI, Rodrigo Procter&Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
KREUZER, Carsten, Heinrich Procter&Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | 03 /
JACKELS, Hans Adolf Procter&Gamble Manufacturing GmbH Industriepark am Silberberg Procter-&-Gamble Str. D-53881 Euskirchen / DE | 04 /
ARIZTI, Blanca Procter&Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | 05 /
BIANCHI, Ernesto, G. Procter&Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | 06 /
ROE, Donald, Carroll 6324 Emberwood Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/33] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 12727751.5 | 08.06.2012 | [2019/33] | WO2012US41493 | Priority number, date | US201161495404P | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161495404 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012170779 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717820 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2717820 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2717820 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/53, A61F13/532, A61F13/49, A61F13/533, A61F13/534, A61F13/535, A61F13/536 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/49001 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/5323 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/535 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/536 (CN,US);
A61F13/532 (US);
A61F13/533 (US);
A61F2013/530226 (CN,US);
A61F2013/530343 (CN,US);
A61F2013/530445 (CN);
A61F2013/530481 (CN,US);
A61F2013/530868 (CN,US);
A61F2013/530897 (CN,US);
A61F2013/53445 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | A61F13/53, A61F13/532, A61F13/533, A61F13/535 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGE STRUKTUR FÜR SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL | [2014/16] | English: | ABSORBENT STRUCTURE FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES | [2014/16] | French: | STRUCTURE ABSORBANTE DESTINÉE À DES ARTICLES ABSORBANTS | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 25.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 16.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2021 | 06.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.01.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.07.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2012 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | IE | 08.06.2020 | LU | 08.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.06.2012 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9951178 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 33 - page 22, line 19; figure -; claim 13 *; | [X]WO2004084784 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15* page 6, line 2 - page 10, line 2; figure -; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2005148258 (CHAKRAVARTY JAYANT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0171]; figure -; claim - * | Examination | EP0824906 | JP2004195254 | JP2005006954 | by applicant | EP0083022 | DE3314019 | WO9015830 | DE4020780 | US5137537 | EP0530438 | EP0543303 | EP0547847 | EP0559476 | WO9321237 | EP0632068 | EP0691133 | US5554145 | US5569234 | US5607760 | US5609587 | DE19543368 | DE19646484 | US5635191 | US5643588 | DE19807992 | EP0937736 | DE19807502 | US6004306 | DE19854573 | DE19854574 | EP1199327 | WO0232962 | WO03031482 | DE10204937 | WO03104299 | WO03104300 | WO03104301 | EP1447067 | DE10331450 | DE10331456 | DE10334584 | DE10355401 | WO2006083584 | WO2007047598 | WO2007046052 | WO2009155265 | WO2009155264 | Opposition | US5846231 | EP1116479 | US2007093164 | US2009266478 |